ALLEGHENY CLINIC v. TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY CLINIC
Defendant: TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC and AUDREY LONGSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00517
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen E. Moore on behalf of ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Moore, Gretchen)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER, Oral Argument on #7 Motion to Dismiss is hereby scheduled for 7/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jms)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AUDREY LONGSON, TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stone, Andrew)
June 17, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #11 Brief in Support of Motion. ERROR: Document incorrectly linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sperling, Gerri) Modified text on 6/17/2019. (ksa)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sperling, Gerri)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBITS A in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AUDREY LONGSON, TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Stone, Andrew)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AUDREY LONGSON, TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Stone, Andrew)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AUDREY LONGSON, TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Conferral, #2 Proposed Order) (Stone, Andrew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC, AUDREY LONGSON Answer due from TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC on 5/31/2019; AUDREY LONGSON on 5/31/2019. (Stone, Andrew)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER and PROCEDURES on Civil Motion Practice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/9/19. (jms)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Errata re #3 Disclosure Statement by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. Reason for Correction: Title. (Sperling, Gerri)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Sperling, Gerri)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Stone, Andrew)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 19-005389 Copies attached: Complaint and Affidavit of Service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5124730), filed by TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC, AUDREY LONGSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEGHENY CLINIC v. TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUDREY LONGSON
Represented By: Andrew M. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY CLINIC
Represented By: Gerri L. Sperling
Represented By: Gretchen E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?