KAUFMAN et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. et al

Plaintiff: WILLIAM KAUFMAN and IRENE HARDING-JESTER
Defendant: RITE AID CORPORATION and JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00520
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF COURT remanding matter to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, PA in re: 16 Order granting Motion to Remand Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/30/2019. (lmt)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/30/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lmt)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by IRENE HARDING-JESTER, WILLIAM KAUFMAN Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/30/2019. (lmt)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Thomas P. Hanna to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/28/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 Errata re #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Thomas P. Hanna by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.. Reason for Correction: Wrong Filer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Hanna, Thomas)
May 28, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Wrong filer. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised that Motions for Pro Hac Vice should be filed and signed by the attorney seeking to be admitted. Attorney is advised to file an ERRATA to the Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 ERROR: WRONG FILER; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; MOTION for attorney Thomas P. Hanna to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5150925) by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 5/28/2019. (cel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 Errata re #10 Brief in Opposition to Motion, by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.. Reason for Correction: Signature. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service) (Lowery, Katherine)
May 16, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Brief in Opposition to Motion. ERROR: Signature is missing. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 ERROR: SIGNATURE IS MISSING; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; BRIEF in Opposition re #4 Motion to Remand filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service) (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 5/16/2019. (cel)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Docket No. 8 Order of Court dated May 8, 2019 by IRENE HARDING-JESTER, WILLIAM KAUFMAN re #8 Order (Shipp, Jason)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/8/19. (ms)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER re #4 Motion to Remand filed by IRENE HARDING-JESTER, WILLIAM KAUFMAN - Responses due by 5/14/2019. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/8/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Remand filed by IRENE HARDING-JESTER, WILLIAM KAUFMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Shipp, Jason)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by IRENE HARDING-JESTER, WILLIAM KAUFMAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shipp, Jason)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Shipp on behalf of IRENE HARDING-JESTER, WILLIAM KAUFMAN. (Shipp, Jason)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying JOHNSON & JOHNSON as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (cel)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD 19-005732 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5124792) filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C - Part 1, #5 Exhibit C - Part 2, #6 Exhibit C - Part 3, #7 Exhibit C - Part 4, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Certificate of Service) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAUFMAN et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM KAUFMAN
Represented By: Leif J. Ocheltree
Represented By: Jason T. Shipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRENE HARDING-JESTER
Represented By: Leif J. Ocheltree
Represented By: Jason T. Shipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Represented By: Thomas P. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?