TUSCARORA WAYNE INSURANCE COMPANY v. KELLY et al
Plaintiff: TUSCARORA WAYNE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: WILLIAM KELLY and SANDRA SIKORSKI
Case Number: 2:2019cv00548
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TUSCARORA WAYNE INSURANCE COMPANY. WILLIAM KELLY waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; SANDRA SIKORSKI waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Long, Louis)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (bdb)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/13/19. (bdb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TUSCARORA WAYNE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Long, Louis)
May 10, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney Long advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 5/17/2019. (ksa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM KELLY, SANDRA SIKORSKI. (ksa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM KELLY, SANDRA SIKORSKI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5131704), filed by TUSCARORA WAYNE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Summons for William Kelly, #6 Summons for Sandra Sikorski) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TUSCARORA WAYNE INSURANCE COMPANY v. KELLY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA SIKORSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TUSCARORA WAYNE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Louis C. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?