KOTUBA v. NORTH SEWICKLEY TOWNSHIP POLICE et al
Plaintiff: JULIE M. KOTUBA
Defendant: JEFFREY S. BECZE and NORTH SEWICKLEY TOWNSHIP POLICE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00552
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF COURT. By July 19, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form, available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to have the case assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/05/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by JEFFREY S. BECZE, NORTH SEWICKLEY TOWNSHIP POLICE Answer due from All Defendants. (Dunlop, Scott)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott G. Dunlop on behalf of JEFFREY S. BECZE, NORTH SEWICKLEY TOWNSHIP POLICE. (Dunlop, Scott)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JULIE M. KOTUBA. JEFFREY S. BECZE waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; NORTH SEWICKLEY TOWNSHIP POLICE waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Quinn, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEFFREY S. BECZE, NORTH SEWICKLEY TOWNSHIP POLICE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5133107), filed by JULIE M. KOTUBA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOTUBA v. NORTH SEWICKLEY TOWNSHIP POLICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE M. KOTUBA
Represented By: John E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY S. BECZE
Represented By: Scott G. Dunlop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH SEWICKLEY TOWNSHIP POLICE
Represented By: Scott G. Dunlop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?