WILLIAMS et al v. MASONIC VILLAGES OF THE GRAND LODGE OF PENNSYLVANIA

Plaintiff: SONSEERIAH WILLIAMS, ANTONJETA ASIKU and NYTAEZIA LUNDY
Defendant: MASONIC VILLAGES OF THE GRAND LODGE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00557
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kobylinski, Peter)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Kobylinski on behalf of ANTONJETA ASIKU, NYTAEZIA LUNDY, SONSEERIAH WILLIAMS. (Kobylinski, David)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 6/24/2019. Case Management set for 7/17/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 5/20/2019. (smc)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 5/20/2019. (smc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by MASONIC VILLAGES OF THE GRAND LODGE OF PENNSYLVANIA. (Candiello, Vincent)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 18-016845 Copies attached: Praecipe for Writ of Summons, Praecipe to Reissue Writ of Summons, Rule, Complaint, Allegheny County Docket Sheet for GD 18-016845, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5133794), filed by MASONIC VILLAGES OF THE GRAND LODGE OF PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (ksa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/13/2019) (ksa) Modified text on 5/14/2019. (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS et al v. MASONIC VILLAGES OF THE GRAND LODGE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONSEERIAH WILLIAMS
Represented By: Peter T. Kobylinski
Represented By: David M. Kobylinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONJETA ASIKU
Represented By: Peter T. Kobylinski
Represented By: David M. Kobylinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYTAEZIA LUNDY
Represented By: Peter T. Kobylinski
Represented By: David M. Kobylinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASONIC VILLAGES OF THE GRAND LODGE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Vincent Candiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?