DURANT v. SOFRANKO et al
Plaintiff: JOHN DURANT
Defendant: RONALD SOFRANKO and SOFRANKO ADVISORY GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00562
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 ***Motions terminated: #10 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by RONALD SOFRANKO. (jd)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 Errata re #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by JOHN DURANT. Reason for Correction: Typographical Correction/Extraneous Word. (Silverberg, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal As To Ronald Sofranko, Individually, Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) without prejudice by JOHN DURANT (Silverberg, James)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF COURT. By July 12, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form, available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to have the case assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 06/21/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Brief in Opposition to #10 Motion to Dismiss due by 7/9/2019; Reply brief due by 7/19/2019. Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 06/18/2019. (atg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SOFRANKO ADVISORY GROUP, LLC. (Saksen, Alexander)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support re #10 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by RONALD SOFRANKO. (Saksen, Alexander)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ronald Sofranko re #1 Complaint,, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by RONALD SOFRANKO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Saksen, Alexander)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SOFRANKO ADVISORY GROUP, LLC. (Saksen, Alexander)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander W. Saksen on behalf of RONALD SOFRANKO, SOFRANKO ADVISORY GROUP, LLC. (Saksen, Alexander)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN DURANT. RONALD SOFRANKO served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Silverberg, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN DURANT. SOFRANKO ADVISORY GROUP, LLC served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Silverberg, James)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 AO 121 NOTICE by JOHN DURANT (Silverberg, James)
May 15, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint,. Attorney to submit AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. Attorney advised to file the Notice within 7 days. The link to the report can be found under Other Forms at: http://www.uscourts.gov/FormsAndFees/Forms/CourtFormsByCategory.aspx (sdp)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for James Lorin Silverberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 05/14/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney James Lorin Silverberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by JOHN DURANT. Fee Paid. 315-5134779 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (sdp)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to RONALD SOFRANKO, SOFRANKO ADVISORY GROUP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (sdp)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RONALD SOFRANKO, SOFRANKO ADVISORY GROUP, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5134644), filed by JOHN DURANT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DURANT v. SOFRANKO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DURANT
Represented By: James L. Silverberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD SOFRANKO
Represented By: Alexander W. Saksen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOFRANKO ADVISORY GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Alexander W. Saksen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?