SILVERMAN et al v. BEHRING et al
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE HAYS and STEPHEN SILVERMAN
Defendant: JOHN C. POPE, DAVID H. KNOPF, ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME, GREGORY E. ABEL, MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, JORGE PAULO LEMANN, ALEXANDRE BEHRING, JEANNE P. JACKSON, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, JOHN T. CAHILL, TRACY BRITT COOL, THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, FEROZ DEWAN, GEORGE ZOGHBI, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER and PAULO BASILIO
Case Number: 2:2019cv00574
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. Based on the filing of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. 33 at 19-433); and, the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. 34 at 19-433), it is hereby ORDERED that #40 Order, is hereby AMENDED as follows: (1) docket numbers 19-549; 19-574; and, 19-613 are hereby CONSOLIDATED at 19-549, the lead case. (2) Any additional stockholder derivative cases filed in or transferred to this Court in the future which involve common questions of law or fact as these consolidated Derivative Actions shall be consolidated with No. 19-549. The balance of #40 Order, remains unchanged. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/25/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) Docket numbers 19-433; 19;-549; 19-567; 19-574 are hereby CONSOLIDATED; (2) Any additional stockholder derivative cases filed in or transferred to this Court in the future which involve common questions of law or fact as these consolidated Derivative Actions shall be consolidated with No. 19-433. (3) As to the existing Complaints in the above- captioned cases, any obligation to respond under Rule 12 is hereby held in abeyance pending further Order of the Court. (4) On or before June 14, 2019, Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases shall file any motions for appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (5) On or before June 28, 2019, Defendants shall file statements of position as to the motions for appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/5/19. (bdb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/4/19. (Court Reporter: Karen Earley) (jad)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #36 Motion for Benny C. Goodman, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/4/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion for Erik W. Luedeke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/4/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for attorney Benny C. Goodman III to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5159584) by CHARLOTTE HAYS, STEPHEN SILVERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Benny C. Goodman III, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Goodman, Benny)
June 3, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for attorney Erik W. Luedeke to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5159582) by CHARLOTTE HAYS, STEPHEN SILVERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erik W. Luedeke, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Luedeke, Erik)
June 3, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Certificate of Service Regarding Service of ADR Notice by CHARLOTTE HAYS, STEPHEN SILVERMAN re #4 Notice of ADR Designation, (Blasy, Mary)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER. A Telephonic Status Conference is hereby SCHEDULED for 6/4/19 at 4:30 PM before Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak. The conference will be held jointly with 2:19-cv-307; 2:19-cv-433; 2:19-cv-549; 2:19-cv-567; and, 2:19-cv-613. Please refer to #6 AT&T Scheduling Notice and use dial-in no. 2 for this conference. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/3/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 30, 2019 Filing 32 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME, GREGORY E. ABEL, PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING, JOHN T. CAHILL, TRACY BRITT COOL, FEROZ DEWAN, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, JEANNE P. JACKSON, DAVID H. KNOPF, JORGE PAULO LEMANN, JOHN C. POPE, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, GEORGE ZOGHBI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kramer, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from ALEXANDRE BEHRING on 7/22/2019 (jv)
May 30, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. GEORGE ZOGHBI waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. JOHN C. POPE waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. JORGE PAULO LEMANN waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. DAVID H. KNOPF waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. JEANNE P. JACKSON waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHARLOTTE HAYS. VINCE GARLATI waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. BERNARDO HEES waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. FEROZ DEWAN served on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. TRACY BRITT COOL waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. JOHN T. CAHILL waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, Alexandre Behring waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019 by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. PAULO BASILIO waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. GREGORY E. ABEL waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Yates, Alfred)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Mary K. Blasy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/30/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Mary K. Blasy to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5154848) by CHARLOTTE HAYS, STEPHEN SILVERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Blasy, Mary)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Andrew J. Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/29/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Andrew J. Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5152845) by PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID H. KNOPF, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, GEORGE ZOGHBI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Ehrlich, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for William A. Clareman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Daniel J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney William A. Clareman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5149732) by PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID H. KNOPF, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, GEORGE ZOGHBI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Clareman, William)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Daniel J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5149566) by PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID H. KNOPF, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, GEORGE ZOGHBI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Kramer, Daniel)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Michael I. Fistel, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/20/19. (jad)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (bdb)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/20/19. (bdb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Michael I. Fistel, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5143025) by CHARLOTTE HAYS, STEPHEN SILVERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael I. Fistel, Jr. in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Fistel, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (ksa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Shareholder Derivative COMPLAINT for Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Corporate Waste, Unjust Enrichment and Contribution for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME, GREGORY E. ABEL, PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING, JOHN T. CAHILL, TRACY BRITT COOL, FEROZ DEWAN, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, JEANNE P. JACKSON, DAVID H. KNOPF, JORGE PAULO LEMANN, JOHN C. POPE, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, GEORGE ZOGHBI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5139916), filed by STEPHEN SILVERMAN, CHARLOTTE HAYS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification of Stephen Silverman, #3 Verification of Charlotte Hays, #4 Summons for The Kraft Heinz Company) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SILVERMAN et al v. BEHRING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE HAYS
Represented By: Alfred G. Yates, Jr.
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Mary K. Blasy
Represented By: Benny C. Goodman, III
Represented By: Erik W. Luedeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN SILVERMAN
Represented By: Alfred G. Yates, Jr.
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Mary K. Blasy
Represented By: Benny C. Goodman, III
Represented By: Erik W. Luedeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C. POPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID H. KNOPF
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY E. ABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE PAULO LEMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRE BEHRING
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANNE P. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCE GARLATI
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARDO HEES
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN T. CAHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY BRITT COOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEROZ DEWAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE ZOGHBI
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULO BASILIO
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?