EASTMAN v. SMITH

Plaintiff: NATHAN B. EASTMAN
Defendant: BRANDON SMITH
Case Number: 2:2019cv00577
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Alan N Bloch
Referring Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bowers, Charles)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by NATHAN B. EASTMAN. (Bowers, Charles)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NATHAN B. EASTMAN. BRANDON SMITH waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Bowers, Charles)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition to #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by NATHAN B. EASTMAN. (Bowers, Charles)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION re #6 TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by NATHAN B. EASTMAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bowers, Charles) Modified text on 7/1/2019 to add document linkage. (nll)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 7/15/2019. Case Management set for 7/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. All counsel and unrepresented parties shall bring their calendars to the conference for scheduling purposes. The parties should be prepared to discuss settlement, the designation of an Alternative Dispute Resolution process and any other matter that will contribute to the prompt disposition of the case. The parties shall be prepared to address and argue all pending motions at the scheduling conference. Any party filing a motion prior to the scheduling conference to which a response is required but not filed shall file a motion for a continuance of the scheduling conference until the response is due. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 6/10/2019. (smc)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 6/10/2019. (smc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BRANDON SMITH. (Fitzpatrick, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BRANDON SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Court) (Fitzpatrick, Michael) Modified text on 6/10/2019. (ksa)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Fitzpatrick on behalf of BRANDON SMITH. (Fitzpatrick, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F. Bowers, III on behalf of NATHAN B. EASTMAN. (Bowers, Charles)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth G. Fawcett on behalf of NATHAN B. EASTMAN. (Fawcett, Kenneth)
May 20, 2019 Judge Joy Flowers Conti added. (jm)
May 20, 2019 Judge Alan N. Bloch no longer assigned to case. (jm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BRANDON SMITH. (ksa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRANDON SMITH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5140498), filed by NATHAN B. EASTMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Brandon Smith) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EASTMAN v. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN B. EASTMAN
Represented By: Kenneth G. Fawcett
Represented By: Charles F. Bowers, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDON SMITH
Represented By: Michael L. Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?