IN RE: THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL P. HENNESSY v. CVS HEALTH CORPORATION

Defendant: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
In Re: IN RE: THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL P. HENNESSY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00579
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/11/19. (jg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by IN RE: THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL P. HENNESSY (Dubosky, Christina)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION; that defendant CVS HEALTH CORPORATION shall answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by 7/12/19. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/11/19. (jg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion or Answer by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Holzworth, Richard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE and Order dated 5/20/19 by IN RE: THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL P. HENNESSY (Dubosky, Christina)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION Answer due from CVS HEALTH CORPORATION on 6/12/2019. (Holzworth, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER indicating that on or before June 19, 2019, all counsel to the above captioned case shall become registered users of the CM/ECF system. Any attorney who is not registered by June 19, 2019, will no longer receive notice regarding any docketing activity in this case initiated from chambers by U.S. mail. This order does not abrogate each party's individual duty to serve each other party with his or her own filings. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 5/20/19. (jg)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 5/20/19. (jg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Westmoreland County, case number 65-18-2121 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5140663) filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL P. HENNESSY v. CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Represented By: Richard L. Holzworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: IN RE: THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL P. HENNESSY
Represented By: Michael J. Stewart
Represented By: Christina M. Dubosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?