FABIAN et al v. SHENKAN et al

Plaintiff: FABIAN LEGAL SERVICES, LLC. and RUDY FABIAN
Defendant: SHENKAN INJURY LAWYERS, LLC. and RICHARD E. SHENKAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00582
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER re #10 and #12 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SHENKAN INJURY LAWYERS, LLC., and RICHARD E. SHENKAN - Response in opposition due by 7/16/2019, Reply brief due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/9/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SHENKAN INJURY LAWYERS, LLC.. (Hogue, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SHENKAN INJURY LAWYERS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Hogue, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by RICHARD E. SHENKAN. (Hogue, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by RICHARD E. SHENKAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Hogue, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Hogue on behalf of SHENKAN INJURY LAWYERS, LLC.. (Hogue, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Hogue on behalf of RICHARD E. SHENKAN. (Hogue, Jon)
July 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan P. Shuber on behalf of RICHARD E. SHENKAN, SHENKAN INJURY LAWYERS, LLC.. (Shuber, Jordan)
July 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. King, III on behalf of RICHARD E. SHENKAN, SHENKAN INJURY LAWYERS, LLC.. (King, Thomas)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 6/10/19. (ms)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
June 7, 2019 Judge Arthur J. Schwab now presiding. (av)
June 7, 2019 Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (av)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Plead in Response to Complaint. Defendant's shall file an answer, motion, or other responsive pleading on or before July 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 5/23/2019. (smc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION to Extend Time to July 8, 2019 by RICHARD E. SHENKAN, SHENKAN INJURY LAWYERS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order) (Shenkan, Richard)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number 19-2418 with jury demand Copies attached: Complaint and exhibits (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5141210), filed by SHENKAN INJURY LAWYERS, LLC., RICHARD E. SHENKAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FABIAN et al v. SHENKAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FABIAN LEGAL SERVICES, LLC.
Represented By: Bernard S. Rubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUDY FABIAN
Represented By: Bernard S. Rubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHENKAN INJURY LAWYERS, LLC.
Represented By: Richard Shenkan
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Richard E. Shenkan
Represented By: Jon Hogue
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD E. SHENKAN
Represented By: Richard Shenkan
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jon Hogue
Represented By: Richard E. Shenkan
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?