COTTER v. AMERICAN BRIDGE COMPANY

Plaintiff: JEANNE COTTER
Defendant: AMERICAN BRIDGE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00592
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Referring Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by AMERICAN BRIDGE COMPANY. (McLaughlin, Erin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JEANNE COTTER. (Black, John)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF COURT. By July 8, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form, available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to have the case assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 06/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
June 21, 2019 Judge Peter J. Phipps now presiding. (av)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak recused. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/21/19. (bdb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Wilk on behalf of AMERICAN BRIDGE COMPANY. (Wilk, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AMERICAN BRIDGE COMPANY. (McLaughlin, Erin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin J. McLaughlin on behalf of AMERICAN BRIDGE COMPANY. (McLaughlin, Erin)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JEANNE COTTER. AMERICAN BRIDGE COMPANY waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Black, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (bdb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/22/19. (bdb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Black, III on behalf of JEANNE COTTER. (Black, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN BRIDGE COMPANY (sdp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN BRIDGE COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5144314), filed by JEANNE COTTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COTTER v. AMERICAN BRIDGE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN BRIDGE COMPANY
Represented By: Erin J. McLaughlin
Represented By: Ryan Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANNE COTTER
Represented By: Samuel J. Cordes
Represented By: John E. Black, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?