FARRELL v. SHANAHAN et al

Plaintiff: ANGELA S. FARRELL
Defendant: MICHAEL ANTHONY VOIT, RANDALL YETMAN, DR. DENIS HUROWITZ, UPMC RADIOLOGY CENTERS, PATRICK SHANAHAN, DR. BRIAN HEIL, PAT BRADY, THE CLEVELAND CLINIC, DR. SUSAN KOLB, BRIG. GENERAL CHARLES G. JEFFRIES, MAGEE HOSPITAL BREAST CENTER and WESTERN PSYCHIATRIC CENTER UPMC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00598
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42:1986
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to Rule 58 entered in the form of the dismissal of plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. This order is entered as the final order in this case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. The clerk of court shall mark the case closed. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/19/19. (rtw)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER ordering that #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ANGELA S. FARRELL is GRANTED, and directing the Clerk of Court to file Plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff's #2 MOTION to Relate Case No. 19-589 to Case No. 11-120 Evidence in Exhibits filed by ANGELA S. FARRELL is DENIED. FURTHER Ordering that the Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/19/19. (rtw)
July 9, 2019 Judge Marilyn J. Horan added as presiding. (cjo)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk is directed to reassign this case to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/9/19. (njt)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Remark: Exhibit #5 received. (ksa)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Relate Case No. 19-589 to Case No. 11-120 Evidence in Exhibits by ANGELA S. FARRELL. (cel)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANGELA S. FARRELL. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 Medical Records, #5 Exhibit 4 Evaluations, #6 Exhibit Confirmation of Validity of Published Affidavits, #7 Exhibit of William E. Binney, #8 Exhibit Affidavit of Geral W. Sosbee, #9 Exhibit Affidavit of Ted. L. Gundelson, #10 Exhibit Affidavit of Angela Sue Farrell Part 1, #11 Exhibit Affidavit of Angela Sue Farrell Part 2, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons) (ksa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2019: #14 Amended Complaint, #15 Summons) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FARRELL v. SHANAHAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL ANTHONY VOIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL YETMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. DENIS HUROWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPMC RADIOLOGY CENTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK SHANAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. BRIAN HEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAT BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CLEVELAND CLINIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. SUSAN KOLB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIG. GENERAL CHARLES G. JEFFRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGEE HOSPITAL BREAST CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN PSYCHIATRIC CENTER UPMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA S. FARRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?