SCHWARTZ v. CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.
Plaintiff: CODY SCHWARTZ
Defendant: CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00631
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT by CODY SCHWARTZ. This document Sealed pursuant to 6 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT by CODY SCHWARTZ. This document Sealed pursuant to 6 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Notice of Settlement filed by CODY SCHWARTZ, Hearing on Settlement set for 8/12/2019 02:15 at PM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Cathy Bissoon. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/12/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement of Seaman's Suit by CODY SCHWARTZ (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McQuiston, David)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Proposed Release and Medical Records of Plaintiff-Seaman. The parties may file the proposed release, which is confidential by its terms, and Plaintiff's medical records under seal. The redaction requirement is WAIVED as to the proposed release and Plaintiff's medical records, and the parties are not required to file redacted versions of those documents. After receiving notice of this Order, you must provide the sealed documents to the Clerk of Court both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Court. The filer is required to serve the sealed documents on opposing counsel using traditional service methods. Documents Sealed Permanently. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/10/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl) Modified text on 7/10/2019. (jjg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ferris, Devon)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.. (Watson, Dennis) Modified text on 7/10/2019. (jjg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A Watson on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.. (Watson, Dennis)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Devon F. Ferris on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.. (Ferris, Devon)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5153433), filed by CODY SCHWARTZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHWARTZ v. CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CODY SCHWARTZ
Represented By: David M. McQuiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Devon F. Ferris
Represented By: Dennis A Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?