IMMEKUS v. PEOPLES NATURAL GAS COMPANY, LLC
Plaintiff: KATHERINE L. IMMEKUS
Defendant: PEOPLES NATURAL GAS COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00666
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER entered pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/31/19. (jg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by KATHERINE L. IMMEKUS. (Bellisario, Domenic)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Clawback Order) (Bellisario, Domenic)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that the parties' Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process are due by 7/30/19; A Case Management Conference is set for 8/6/19 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 5B before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/2/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PEOPLES NATURAL GAS COMPANY, LLC. (Presley, Marla)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses by PEOPLES NATURAL GAS COMPANY, LLC. (Presley, Marla)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary J. Mueller on behalf of PEOPLES NATURAL GAS COMPANY, LLC. (Mueller, Zachary)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla N. Presley on behalf of PEOPLES NATURAL GAS COMPANY, LLC. (Presley, Marla)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Newborg on behalf of KATHERINE L. IMMEKUS. (Newborg, John)
June 13, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Document was not linked to document 4. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Documents 3 and 4 by KATHERINE L. IMMEKUS re #3 Notice of ADR Designation, #4 ORDER (Bellisario, Domenic) Modified text on 6/13/2019 to add document linkage. (ept)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KATHERINE L. IMMEKUS. PEOPLES NATURAL GAS COMPANY, LLC served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Bellisario, Domenic)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/10/19. (jg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PEOPLES NATURAL GAS COMPANY, LLC (ept)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PEOPLES NATURAL GAS COMPANY, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5164830), filed by KATHERINE L. IMMEKUS. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMMEKUS v. PEOPLES NATURAL GAS COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE L. IMMEKUS
Represented By: Domenic A. Bellisario
Represented By: John David Newborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEOPLES NATURAL GAS COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Zachary J. Mueller
Represented By: Marla N. Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?