NAGY v. WOODLAND HILLS SCHOOL DISTRICT
Plaintiff: CANDEE NAGY
Defendant: WOODLAND HILLS SCHOOL DISTRICT
Case Number: 2:2019cv00668
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick J. Wolfe on behalf of WOODLAND HILLS SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Wolfe, Frederick)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of CANDEE NAGY. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CANDEE NAGY. WOODLAND HILLS SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Sansone, Joel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WOODLAND HILLS SCHOOL DISTRICT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5165328), filed by CANDEE NAGY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAGY v. WOODLAND HILLS SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOODLAND HILLS SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Frederick J. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANDEE NAGY
Represented By: Joel S. Sansone
Represented By: Elizabeth Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?