BRAUER v. NORTH ALLEGHENY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH A. BRAUER
Defendant: NORTH ALLEGHENY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Case Number: 2:2019cv00674
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR: No answer due date generated because attorney performed event incorrectly to set answer due date. CORRECTION: answer due date set by court and entry completed correctly with service date and answer due date inserted. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
July 3, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from NORTH ALLEGHENY SCHOOL DISTRICT on 8/18/2019 (jv)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/18/2019; SSA by ELIZABETH A. BRAUER. (Myers, Jeffrey) Modified text on 7/3/2019 to change dates to reflect service date and answer due date. (jv)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/25/2019. (sms)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NORTH ALLEGHENY SCHOOL DISTRICT (jv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORTH ALLEGHENY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5163354), filed by ELIZABETH A. BRAUER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to NorthAllegheny School District) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRAUER v. NORTH ALLEGHENY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH ALLEGHENY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH A. BRAUER
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?