WEBER v. PNC INVESTMENTS LLC
Plaintiff: DOMINIK WEBER
Defendant: PNC INVESTMENTS LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00704
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF re #1 Complaint/Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by DOMINIK WEBER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Archinaco, Jason) Modified text on 8/15/2019. (ept)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff's Reply Brief that is due on or before August 16, 2019 may exceed ten (10) but shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/13/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by DOMINIK WEBER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Archinaco, Jason)
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement identifying The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PNC INVESTMENTS LLC. (Lieberman, Frederic)
July 29, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #17 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 8/5/2019. (jv)
July 26, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PNC INVESTMENTS LLC (Lieberman, Frederic)
July 26, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Order re #18 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by PNC INVESTMENTS LLC. (Lieberman, Frederic)
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support re #18 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate filed by PNC INVESTMENTS LLC. (Lieberman, Frederic)
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 Cross MOTION Confirm Arbitration Award by PNC INVESTMENTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14) (Lieberman, Frederic)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PNC INVESTMENTS LLC. (Lieberman, Frederic)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Frederic L. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/19/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 Errata re #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Frederic L. Lieberman by PNC INVESTMENTS LLC. Reason for Correction: Signatures did not match. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Lieberman, Frederic)
July 9, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #14 Errata. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (av)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 Errata re #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Frederic Lieberman by PNC INVESTMENTS LLC. Reason for Correction: Not registered ECF user. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Lieberman, Frederic)
July 2, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised of signature requirements. Attorney is advised to resubmit the documents with a proposed order under the correct filer by using the ERRATA event and linking it to the document in question. (av)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DEFERRING RULING ON #10 Motion for Frederic L. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ruling is DEFERRED pending said counsel becoming a registered user of the Court' CM/ECF filing system. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/2/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Kays on behalf of PNC INVESTMENTS LLC. (Kays, Danielle)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Danielle M. Kays to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/28/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Frederic L. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5192450) by PNC INVESTMENTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission pro hac vice) (Burgo, Raeann)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Danielle M. Kays to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5190497) by PNC INVESTMENTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Danielle M. Kays) (Kays, Danielle)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER APPROVING #7 Stipulation. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. Defendant's time to serve its response to Plaintiff's motion to vacate the arbitration award is extended to and including July 26, 2019. 2. Plaintiff's time to serve his reply is extended to and including August 16, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/26/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time by PNC INVESTMENTS LLC. (Burgo, Raeann)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Raeann Burgo on behalf of PNC INVESTMENTS LLC. (Burgo, Raeann)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/19/19. (jad)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEBER v. PNC INVESTMENTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIK WEBER
Represented By: Jason A. Archinaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC INVESTMENTS LLC
Represented By: Raeann Burgo
Represented By: Frederic L. Lieberman
Represented By: Danielle Kays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?