SILVERBERG v. WESTMORELAND COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE et al
Plaintiff: STUART SILVERBERG
Defendant: WESTMORELAND COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE and RICHARD HOLLER
Case Number: 2:2019cv00705
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re First Amended Complaint by STUART SILVERBERG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cairone, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda V. Hernandez on behalf of WESTMORELAND COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE. (Hernandez, Linda)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Roche, Jr on behalf of RICHARD HOLLER. (Roche, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan T. Roberts on behalf of RICHARD HOLLER. (Roberts, Susan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STUART SILVERBERG. RICHARD HOLLER waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Cairone, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L. Luvara on behalf of WESTMORELAND COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE. (Luvara, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STUART SILVERBERG. WESTMORELAND COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Cairone, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/19/2019. (jgb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICHARD HOLLER, WESTMORELAND COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5175216), filed by STUART SILVERBERG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SILVERBERG v. WESTMORELAND COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STUART SILVERBERG
Represented By: Matthew C. Cairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTMORELAND COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Joseph L. Luvara
Represented By: Linda V. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD HOLLER
Represented By: Michael J Roche, Jr.
Represented By: Susan T. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?