TC TRANSCONTINENTAL PRINTING v. ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: TC TRANSCONTINENTAL PRINTING
Defendant: ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC. and BRYAN SEATON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00706
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Peter J Phipps
Referring Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan for all further proceedings. Judge Peter J. Phipps no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 08/07/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Gaul, Stuart)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against TC TRANSCONTINENTAL PRINTING by BRYAN SEATON, ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Gaul, Stuart)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing that, although Judge Peter J. Phipps is no longer the presiding judge of any case pending in this court, the docket in those cases over which he presided will continue to reflect him as the presiding judicial officer until such time as they are reassigned to another judicial officer of this court. Until that time, the Chief Judge or his designee will address any motions or other matters that may require judicial action in those cases; Any inquires regarding these matters shall be directed to Deputy Clerk Beth Abbott at (412) 208-7390. This Order will remain in effect until modified or vacated by further order of court. See order at 2:19-mc-00858. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Benjamin E. Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/16/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Benjamin E. Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5210463) by TC TRANSCONTINENTAL PRINTING. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Benjamin E. Gordon, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Gordon, Benjamin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by TC TRANSCONTINENTAL PRINTING. BRYAN SEATON served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Bloom, Jonathan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by TC TRANSCONTINENTAL PRINTING. ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Bloom, Jonathan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying Transcontinental Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TC TRANSCONTINENTAL PRINTING. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bloom, Jonathan)
June 17, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 6/24/2019. (ept)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., BRYAN SEATON (ept)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., BRYAN SEATON (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5175388), filed by TC TRANSCONTINENTAL PRINTING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Summons Action Lab, #7 Summons Seaton) (ept) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TC TRANSCONTINENTAL PRINTING v. ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TC TRANSCONTINENTAL PRINTING
Represented By: Jonathan F. Bloom
Represented By: Benjamin E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By: Stuart C. Gaul, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN SEATON
Represented By: Stuart C. Gaul, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?