RUFFING v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: LAUREN RUFFING
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION and ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00707
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Referring Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak is presiding and Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly is referred. Motions referred to Maureen P. Kelly. (jm)
July 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly no longer presiding. (jm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by LAUREN RUFFING. (Joseph, Justin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION. (O'Connell, R.)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Booth on behalf of LAUREN RUFFING. (Booth, Patrick)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 07/26/2019, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 7/26/2019; Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/17/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tjw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin D. Joseph on behalf of LAUREN RUFFING. (Joseph, Justin)
July 12, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Signing attorney (Justin Joseph) to resubmit the document using Notice of Appearance event using his ECF account. (nll)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by LAUREN RUFFING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Chaffin, Eric) Modified text on 7/12/2019 to add document linkage. (nll)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric T. Chaffin on behalf of LAUREN RUFFING. (Chaffin, Eric) Removed from public view and redocketed at #9 . Modified text on 7/16/2019. (nll)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Response re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Response to Motion due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 06/20/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tjw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION. (O'Connell, R.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Connell, R.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Connell, R.) Modified text on 6/20/2019. (ksa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig W. Beil on behalf of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION. (Beil, Craig)
June 18, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney O'Connell advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 6/25/2019. (ksa)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County, case number 2019-1423 Copies attached: Complaint and Praecipe for Appearance (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5175635), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION, ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Praecipe for Appearance) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUFFING v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN RUFFING
Represented By: Eric T. Chaffin
Represented By: Patrick C. Booth
Represented By: Justin D. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: R. Sean O'Connell
Represented By: Craig W. Beil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION
Represented By: R. Sean O'Connell
Represented By: Craig W. Beil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: R. Sean O'Connell
Represented By: Craig W. Beil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?