SHOOK v. WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC et al

Plaintiff: BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK
Defendant: WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC and W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00726
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Vaughn, Joshua)
August 9, 2019 Filing 26 W.D. Wright Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC.. (Kunselman, Harry)
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Angotti on behalf of WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Angotti, Christian)
August 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE Opt-In Consent Form of Mary Madden by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK (Groh, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael P. Murphy, Jr. on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 8/7/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's Order or Notice on the matter. (njt)
August 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Michael Murphy, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5237267) by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Murphy, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Vaughn, Joshua)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER scheduling Initial Case Management Conference for 8/28/19 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 conference to be held on or before 8/9/19. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process and Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/19/19. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/17/19. (njt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (njt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean E. Novak on behalf of W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC., WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Novak, Jean)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Tragone on behalf of W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC. (Tragone, Adam) Modified text on 7/16/2019. (ept)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC. (Kunselman, Harry) Modified text on 7/16/2019. (ept)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry F. Kunselman on behalf of W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC., WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Kunselman, Harry)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC. Answer due from W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC. on 8/9/2019. (Kunselman, Harry)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC Answer due from WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC on 8/9/2019. (Vaughn, Joshua)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michalski on behalf of WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Michalski, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Vaughn on behalf of WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Vaughn, Joshua)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Opt-In Consent Forms of Brian Pfender and Bryan Allen Shook by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK (Groh, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Opt-In Consent Form of Alex Shaner by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK (Groh, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Opt-In Consent Form of Donald Shook by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK (Groh, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Opt-In Consent Form of Reed Melvin by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK (Groh, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Opt-In Consent Form of Joseph Wiegel by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK (Groh, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ORDER granting #3 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Groh on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 6/28/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's Order or Notice on the matter. (njt)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Order re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK. (Groh, Michael)
June 25, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (ept)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Michael Groh, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5184142) by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A) (Groh, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC., WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Wright of Pennsylvania) (ept)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC., WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5177779), filed by BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Wright of Pennsylvania, #3 Summons W.D. Wright) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHOOK v. WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN ALLEN SHOOK
Represented By: Rachel Stevens
Represented By: Michael Groh
Represented By: Michael P. Murphy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WRIGHT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Michalski
Represented By: Joshua Vaughn
Represented By: Christian Angotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC.
Represented By: Adam J. Tragone
Represented By: Jean E. Novak
Represented By: Harry F. Kunselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?