HUB PARKING TECHNOLOGY USA, INC. v. ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: HUB PARKING TECHNOLOGY USA, INC.
Defendant: ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00727
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jgb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Weiss, Aaron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying AIG Property Casualty U.S.,; AIG Property Casualty Inc.; American International Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Weiss, Aaron)
July 18, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/25/2019. (nll)
July 16, 2019 ****Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY on 7/31/2019. (jgb) Modified text on 7/17/2019. (ept)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY Answer due 7/16/2019 from ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Weiss, Aaron) Modified text on 7/16/2019. (nll)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron S. Weiss on behalf of ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Weiss, Aaron)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by HUB PARKING TECHNOLOGY USA, INC.. ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cahillane, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HUB PARKING TECHNOLOGY USA, INC. (Salemme, James) Modified text on 6/24/2019. (ksa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James Andrew Salemme on behalf of HUB PARKING TECHNOLOGY USA, INC.. (Salemme, James)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/21/2019. (jgb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (ksa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5177857), filed by HUB PARKING TECHNOLOGY USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Summons for Illinois National Insurance Company) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUB PARKING TECHNOLOGY USA, INC. v. ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILLINOIS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Aaron S. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUB PARKING TECHNOLOGY USA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher W. Cahillane
Represented By: James Andrew Salemme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?