CAMBRIDGE RETIREMENT SYSTEM v. EQT CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: CAMBRIDGE RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Defendant: STEPHEN A. THORINGTON, ROBERT J. MCNALLY, JIMMI SUE SMITH, STEVEN T. SCHLOTTERBECK, DAVID L. PORGES, LEE T. TODD, JR., CHRISTINE J. TORETTI, JAMES E. ROHR, DANIEL J. RICE, IV, VICKY A. BAILEY, EQT CORPORATION, PHILIP G. BEHRMAN, ROBERT F. VAGT, MARGARET K. DORMAN, KENNETH M. BURKE and A. BRAY CARY, JR.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00754
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EQT CORPORATION. (Allen, Thomas)
August 12, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/19/2019. (ept)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Phelps on behalf of EQT CORPORATION. (Phelps, Brian)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Rockney on behalf of EQT CORPORATION. (Rockney, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Allen on behalf of EQT CORPORATION. (Allen, Thomas)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Approving #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer filed by EQT CORPORATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 08/08/2019. (tjw)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by EQT CORPORATION Answer due from EQT CORPORATION. (Allen, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by CAMBRIDGE RETIREMENT SYSTEM. EQT CORPORATION served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Burkardt, M)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to VICKY A. BAILEY, PHILIP G. BEHRMAN, KENNETH M. BURKE, A. BRAY CARY, JR, MARGARET K. DORMAN, EQT CORPORATION, ROBERT J. MCNALLY, DAVID L. PORGES, DANIEL J. RICE, IV, JAMES E. ROHR, STEVEN T. SCHLOTTERBECK, JIMMI SUE SMITH, STEPHEN A. THORINGTON, LEE T. TODD, JR, CHRISTINE J. TORETTI, ROBERT F. VAGT (cjo)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by CAMBRIDGE RETIREMENT SYSTEM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Burkardt, M)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VICKY A. BAILEY, PHILIP G. BEHRMAN, KENNETH M. BURKE, A. BRAY CARY, JR, MARGARET K. DORMAN, EQT CORPORATION, ROBERT J. MCNALLY, DAVID L. PORGES, DANIEL J. RICE, IV, JAMES E. ROHR, STEVEN T. SCHLOTTERBECK, JIMMI SUE SMITH, STEPHEN A. THORINGTON, LEE T. TODD, JR, CHRISTINE J. TORETTI, ROBERT F. VAGT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5187554), filed by CAMBRIDGE RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMBRIDGE RETIREMENT SYSTEM v. EQT CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN A. THORINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT J. MCNALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIMMI SUE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN T. SCHLOTTERBECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID L. PORGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE T. TODD, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE J. TORETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES E. ROHR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL J. RICE, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICKY A. BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQT CORPORATION
Represented By: Brian T. Phelps
Represented By: James L. Rockney
Represented By: Thomas L. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP G. BEHRMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT F. VAGT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET K. DORMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH M. BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. BRAY CARY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMBRIDGE RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Represented By: M J Burkardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?