RUSH v. RANGE RESOURCES CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: HEATHER RUSH
Defendant: RANGE RESOURCES CORPORATION and RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00763
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory E. Ridenour on behalf of RANGE RESOURCES CORPORATION, RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Ridenour, Cory)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer G. Betts on behalf of RANGE RESOURCES CORPORATION, RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Betts, Jennifer)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HEATHER RUSH. RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Groh, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Michael Groh, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/01/2019. (tjw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for attorney Michael Groh, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5193633) by HEATHER RUSH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Groh, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Groh, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Summons Issued as to RANGE RESOURCES CORPORATION, RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC (jv)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RANGE RESOURCES CORPORATION, RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5191120), filed by HEATHER RUSH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Range Resources-Appalachia, LLC, #3 Summons as to Range Resources Corporation) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUSH v. RANGE RESOURCES CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANGE RESOURCES CORPORATION
Represented By: Cory E. Ridenour
Represented By: Jennifer G. Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC
Represented By: Cory E. Ridenour
Represented By: Jennifer G. Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER RUSH
Represented By: Rachel Stevens
Represented By: Michael Groh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?