FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA v. TINGLER RENTAL PROPERTIES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA
Defendant: TINGLER RENTAL PROPERTIES, LLC, SCOTT D. TINGLER and AMY L. TINGLER
Consolidated Defendant: BRUCETON PHARMACY, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00764
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Mediation: Case has not been resolved. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 7/29/2019. (Frampton, Thomas)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases with C.A. 19-766 filed by AMY L. TINGLER. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE FILED UNDER CASE NO. 2:19-764. All previously entered orders filed at tis case immediately apply to consolidated case. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/12/19. (lck)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Order re #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases by AMY L. TINGLER. (Wagoner, Edmund)
July 11, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (av)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support re #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by AMY L. TINGLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Complaint in Rental Action, #3 Exhibit B- Complaint in Pharmacy Action, #4 Exhibit C- Petition in Rental Action, #5 Exhibit D- Petition in Pharmacy Action) (Wagoner, Edmund)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by AMY L. TINGLER. (Wagoner, Edmund)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Initial ADR Conference by THOMAS T. FRAMPTON. Initial ADR Conference Date July 29, 2019 9:30 a.m., Waterfront Corporate Park, 2100 Georgetowne Dr., Suite 300, Sewickley, PA 15143 (Frampton, Thomas)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Hon. Thomas T. Frampton is appointed as mediator. Mediation is scheduled for 7/29/19. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/1/19. (ms)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/1/19. (ms)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas, case number GD-19-007675 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5191389), filed by AMY L. TINGLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Complaint in Confession of Judgment, #2 Exhibit - Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (av)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA v. TINGLER RENTAL PROPERTIES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TINGLER RENTAL PROPERTIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT D. TINGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY L. TINGLER
Represented By: Edmund L. Wagoner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Preston D. Jaquish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: BRUCETON PHARMACY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?