FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA v. BRUCETON PHARMACY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA
Defendant: BRUCETON PHARMACY, LLC, SCOTT D. TINGLER and AMY L. TINGLER
Case Number: 2:2019cv00766
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Referring Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Arthur J. Schwab for all further proceedings filed at C.A. 19-764. Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/12/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases as more fully set forth in the attached Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark this CASE CLOSED. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/11/2019. (sms)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by AMY L. TINGLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Complaint in Rental Action, #3 Exhibit B- Complaint in Pharmacy Action, #4 Exhibit C- Petition in Rental Action, #5 Exhibit D- Petition in Pharmacy Action) (Wagoner, Edmund)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by AMY L. TINGLER. (Wagoner, Edmund)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/1/2019. (sms)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas, case number GD-19007671 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5191619), filed by AMY L. TINGLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - County Complaint, #3 Exhibit - Docket Sheet) (av)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA v. BRUCETON PHARMACY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCETON PHARMACY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT D. TINGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY L. TINGLER
Represented By: Edmund L. Wagoner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Preston D. Jaquish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?