MCKINNEY et al v. BOSER et al
Plaintiff: KAREN MCKINNEY, D&K CONTRACTING, LLC and DARIAN MCKINNEY
Defendant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY, PAYNEWEST INSURANCE, VICKI L. BOSER, NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, COCHRAN AGENCY INC. and ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00771
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative defenses by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement identifying WR Berkley Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce E. Rende on behalf of NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Rende, Bruce)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Miller, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/17/2019. (jjg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Miller, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/17/2019. (jjg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WESTERN HERITAGE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Miller, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/17/2019. (jjg)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER approving #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer filed by NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY. COCHRAN AGENCY INC. answer due 8/31/2019; NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 8/31/2019; PAYNEWEST INSURANCE answer due 8/31/2019; SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 8/31/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/10/2019. (sms)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving #6 Stipulation filed by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 8/1/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/10/2019. (sms)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of the Parties by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smallwood, Edward)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY Answer due from NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY on 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/2/2019. (sms)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (jjg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas, case number GD 19-007932 with Jury Demand. Copies attached: Complaint, Affidavits of Service, and Praecipes for Appearance (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5192957), filed by NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Affidavit of Service, #5 Affidavit of Service, #6 Affidavit of Service, #7 Affidavit of Service, #8 Praecipe for Appearance, #9 Praecipe for Appearance) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCKINNEY et al v. BOSER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN MCKINNEY
Represented By: Matthew J. Scanlon
Represented By: Timothy Grant Wojton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D&K CONTRACTING, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Scanlon
Represented By: Timothy Grant Wojton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARIAN MCKINNEY
Represented By: Matthew J. Scanlon
Represented By: Timothy Grant Wojton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jennifer L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAYNEWEST INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICKI L. BOSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jennifer L. Miller
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COCHRAN AGENCY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?