INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 95-95A v. FARMLAND FOODS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 95-95A
Defendant: FARMLAND FOODS, INC. and SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00785
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY BRIEF re #23 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP.. (Simmons, Brian)
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 BRIEF in Opposition re #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 95-95A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order) (Gilardi, Richard)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER re #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP. - Response due by 8/19/2019 and Reply brief due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/9/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Kurt G. Larkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/9/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Tyler S. Laughinghouse to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/9/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Kurt G. Larkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5240953) by FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Larkin, Kurt)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Tyler S. Laughinghouse to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5240920) by FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Laughinghouse, Tyler)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Antkowiak on behalf of FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP.. (Antkowiak, Christian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support re #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP.. (Simmons, Brian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE Certificate of Conferral by FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP. re #5 Order, #14 Motion to Dismiss (Simmons, Brian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Simmons, Brian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement identifying Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP.. (Simmons, Brian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. t/d/b/a Farmland Foods, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP.. (Simmons, Brian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying Farmland Foods, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP. (Simmons, Brian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian H. Simmons on behalf of FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP.. (Simmons, Brian)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 95-95A. (Gilardi, Richard)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 95-95A. SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Gilardi, Richard)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 95-95A. FARMLAND FOODS, INC. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Gilardi, Richard)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Louis B. Kushner is appointed as mediator. Mediation is scheduled for 9/16/19. Counsel for Plaintiff is required to personally serve this Order on the Defendants. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/11/19. (ms)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/3/19. (ms)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FARMLAND FOODS, INC.,SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP., AND SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP. Modified text on 7/2/2019. (cjo)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 95-95A (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Gilardi, Richard)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FARMLAND FOODS, INC., SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5195767), filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 95-95A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (mao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 95-95A v. FARMLAND FOODS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARMLAND FOODS, INC.
Represented By: Brian H. Simmons
Represented By: Kurt G. Larkin
Represented By: Tyler S. Laughinghouse
Represented By: Christian Antkowiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP.
Represented By: Brian H. Simmons
Represented By: Kurt G. Larkin
Represented By: Tyler S. Laughinghouse
Represented By: Christian Antkowiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS, LOCAL 95-95A
Represented By: Richard P. Gilardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?