ELBORNE v. ISDA THE OFFICE SYSTEMS COOPERATIVE et al
Plaintiff: DONALD ELBORNE
Defendant: ISDA THE OFFICE SYSTEMS COOPERATIVE, DONNA TAMBURO-WILSON, RENEE WOFFORD and ISDA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00792
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Peter J Phipps
Referring Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/3/2019. Stipulation due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/30/2019. (av)
August 30, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from ISDA THE OFFICE SYSTEMS COOPERATIVE on 9/30/2019 (av)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. McGovern on behalf of ISDA THE OFFICE SYSTEMS COOPERATIVE, DONNA TAMBURO-WILSON, RENEE WOFFORD. (McGovern, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DONALD ELBORNE. (Antonelli, Stephen)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan for all further proceedings. Judge Peter J. Phipps no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 08/07/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to ISDA THE OFFICE SYSTEMS COOPERATIVE (jm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by DONALD ELBORNE. DONNA TAMBURO-WILSON served on 7/13/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Farone, Alexandra)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by DONALD ELBORNE. RENEE WOFFORD served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Farone, Alexandra)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to Reissue Summons by DONALD ELBORNE (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Farone, Alexandra)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing that, although Judge Peter J. Phipps is no longer the presiding judge of any case pending in this court, the docket in those cases over which he presided will continue to reflect him as the presiding judicial officer until such time as they are reassigned to another judicial officer of this court. Until that time, the Chief Judge or his designee will address any motions or other matters that may require judicial action in those cases; Any inquires regarding these matters shall be directed to Deputy Clerk Beth Abbott at (412) 208-7390. This Order will remain in effect until modified or vacated by further order of court. See order at 2:19-mc-00858. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ISDA THE OFFICE SYSTEMS COOPERATIVE, DONNA TAMBURO-WILSON, RENEE WOFFORD (av)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ISDA THE OFFICE SYSTEMS COOPERATIVE, DONNA TAMBURO-WILSON, RENEE WOFFORD (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5196494), filed by DONALD ELBORNE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons - ISDA, #8 Proposed Summons - Tamburo-Wilson, #9 Proposed Summons - Wofford) (av)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELBORNE v. ISDA THE OFFICE SYSTEMS COOPERATIVE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISDA THE OFFICE SYSTEMS COOPERATIVE
Represented By: James A. McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA TAMBURO-WILSON
Represented By: James A. McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENEE WOFFORD
Represented By: James A. McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISDA
Represented By: James A. McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD ELBORNE
Represented By: Stephen A. Antonelli
Represented By: Alexandra Farone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?