BORGHETTI et al v. CBD USA GROWN, INC. et al
Plaintiff: PETER BORGHETTI and CHERYLANN BORGHETTI
Defendant: GREENLEAF GOLDEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMA HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC, CBD USA GROWN, INC. and DEBORAH GESTNER
Case Number: 2:2019cv00798
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CBD USA GROWN, INC., DEBORAH GESTNER, GREENLEAF GOLDEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMA HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC. (Dalfonso, Joseph)
July 16, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/23/2019. (nll)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHERYLANN BORGHETTI, PETER BORGHETTI. DEBORAH GESTNER waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Papciak, Justin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHERYLANN BORGHETTI, PETER BORGHETTI. GREENLEAF GOLDEN ENTERPRISES, LLC waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Papciak, Justin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHERYLANN BORGHETTI, PETER BORGHETTI. KMA HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Papciak, Justin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHERYLANN BORGHETTI, PETER BORGHETTI. CBD USA GROWN, INC. waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Papciak, Justin)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/11/2019. (jgb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 REDACTION to #1 Complaint by CHERYLANN BORGHETTI, PETER BORGHETTI. (Papciak, Justin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary J. Matta on behalf of CBD USA GROWN, INC., DEBORAH GESTNER, GREENLEAF GOLDEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMA HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC. (Matta, Gary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Dalfonso on behalf of CBD USA GROWN, INC., DEBORAH GESTNER, GREENLEAF GOLDEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMA HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC. (Dalfonso, Joseph)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CBD USA GROWN, INC., DEBORAH GESTNER, GREENLEAF GOLDEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMA HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC (nll)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CBD USA GROWN, INC., DEBORAH GESTNER, GREENLEAF GOLDEN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMA HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5197969), filed by CHERYLANN BORGHETTI, PETER BORGHETTI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Summons CBD USA Grown, INC., #11 Summons KMA Holdings Groups, LLC, #12 Summons Greenleaf Golden Enterprises, LLC, #13 Summons Deborah Gestner) (nll) Per chambers attachments B, C, D placed under seal. Modified text on 7/9/2019. (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BORGHETTI et al v. CBD USA GROWN, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER BORGHETTI
Represented By: Justin T. Papciak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYLANN BORGHETTI
Represented By: Justin T. Papciak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENLEAF GOLDEN ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Joseph R. Dalfonso
Represented By: Gary J. Matta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMA HOLDINGS GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Joseph R. Dalfonso
Represented By: Gary J. Matta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBD USA GROWN, INC.
Represented By: Joseph R. Dalfonso
Represented By: Gary J. Matta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH GESTNER
Represented By: Joseph R. Dalfonso
Represented By: Gary J. Matta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?