MEINEKE FRANCHISOR SPV, LLC v. FAYER et al
Plaintiff: MEINEKE FRANCHISOR SPV, LLC
Defendant: ISAAK FAYER and MARGARITA FAYER
Case Number: 2:2019cv00820
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Default Judgment: Plaintiff, MEINEKE FRANCHISOR SPV, LLC, successor-in-interest to MEINEKE CAR CENTER CENTERS, LLC, successor-in-interest to MEINEKE DISCOUNT MUFFLER SHOPS, INC., recover of the Defendants ISAAK FAYER and MARGARITA FAYER, the sum of $89,481.49, plus costs and interest according to the law from the date of this judgment until the entire amount is paid. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/5/2019. (jgb)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants by MEINEKE FRANCHISOR SPV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order) (Hashmi, Asra)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff's Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award [Dkt 1] served on Isaak Fayer and Margarita Fayer on July 25, 2019, filed by MEINEKE FRANCHISOR SPV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hashmi, Asra)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/12/2019. (jgb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against ISAAK FAYER, MARGARITA FAYER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5204225), filed by MEINEKE FRANCHISOR SPV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEINEKE FRANCHISOR SPV, LLC v. FAYER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEINEKE FRANCHISOR SPV, LLC
Represented By: Asra Hashmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISAAK FAYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARITA FAYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?