DATA et al v. A.O. SMITH CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: DARLENE DATA, MICHAEL DATA and DARLENE DATA, EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL DATA, DECEASED,
Defendant: POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS, BAKER HUGHES, a GE Company, LLC, ERIE CITY IRON WORKS, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, ACCO MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTION, INC., TUTHILL CORPORATION, ATWOOD & MORRILL Co., Inc., FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, CLYDE UNION, INC., CASHCO INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., MESTEK, INC., THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, MACK TRUCKS, INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY,, MAGNETEK, INC., CUMMINS, INC., ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., MCCARLS, INC., MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, LINDBERG MPH, DANA COMPANIES, LLC, VELAN VALVE CORPORATION, VIKING PUMP, INC., DRAVO CORPORATION, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY, WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC., FLOWSERVE US, INC., MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC., LINDBERG, TRUMBELL INDUSTRIES, INC., MCNALLY INDUSTRIES, LLC,, MALLINCKRODT US HOLDINGS, LLC, MINE SAFETY APPLIANCE COMPANY, ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION COMPANY, CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, DAP, INC, UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION, MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION, WATSON McDANIEL COMPANY, KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY, FLOWSERVE US, INC, Pacific Parts, WEIL-MCLAIN COMPANY, A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC, JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC., AURORA PUMPS, CRANE COMPANY, INC., CROWN CORK & SEAL USA, INC., LEEDS & NORTHRUP COMPANY, THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, MCMASTER CARR SUPPLY, NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC, ROBINSON FANS, INC., STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC, YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY, WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC., CORNING IN CORPORA TED, PECORA CORPORATION, YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC, WARREN PUMPS, LLC, M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC., NAGLE PUMPS, INC., MOYNO, INC., MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION, SUNDYNE, LLC, MEAD, ALF A LAV AL, INC., SURFACE COMBUSTION, MCNALLY INDUSTRIES, LLC, MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY, GOULD ELECTRONICS INC., Harnischfeger Corporation, UNIION BOILER COMPANY, ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC. doing business as Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc., VIACOM, INC., URS Energy & Construction Inc., American Standard Corporation, SQUARE D COMPANY, FSD Corp., AMERICAN RADIATOR & STANDARD SANITARY, ROBERTSON CECO CORPORATION, UNION BOILER COMPANY, ALLIED SIGNAL, INC., Raytheon Engineers and Constructors, Inc., CLYDE UNION, INC. individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company doing business as CLYDE UNION PUMPS, DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, AQUA-CHEM, INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE COMPANY, P&H Mining equipment,, DeValco Corporation Inc., Duriron Company, Inc, JOY TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Marley Cooling Technologies, Inc., THE MARLEY COOLING TOWER COMPANY, CARBORUNDUM CORPORATION, IMO DELAVAL, INC., ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., ALLIED SIGNAL, INC, METROPOLITAN INSURANCE COMPANY, Pacific Parts, Inc, RUST ENGINEERING COMPANY, Cooper Cameron Corporation, TRUMBELL INDUSTRIES, INC. doing business as Trumbell Supply Company., Inc, GD- TEK, INC., FULLER COMPANY, RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, Catalytic Construction Company, WCI Outdoor Products, Inc, NORTON COMPANY, Whiting Corporation, WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION, Mahoning Valley Supply Company of Youngstown Ohio, Crown Cork & Seal Company (USA), Inc., Keystone Valves and Controls, Inc., DELAVAL TURBINE, INC. and SULZER PUMPS SOLUTIONS, INC.
Cross Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES, MET-PRO CORPORATION, CARVER PUMP COMPANY, CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING AMERICA, LLC, HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC., ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC., RILEY POWER, INC., WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL, WT/HRC CORPORATION, SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., GRINNELL, LLC, BRAND INSULATIONS, INC., BURNHAM LLC, CATERPILLAR, INC., SPIRAX SARCO, INC., JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC, INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES, INC., ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC., AHLSTROM PUMPS LLC, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, CARRIER CORPORATION, BEAZER EAST, INC., PNEUMO ABEX, LLC, RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC., PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY, AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION, GARDNER DENVER, INC., AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, INDUSTRIAL RUBBER PRODUCTS, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., NAVISTAR, INC., HONEYWELL, INC., DANIELI CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, ROBBINS & MYERS, INC., GUARD LINE, INC., A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, SAUER, INC., REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC., TRANE U.S. INC., BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC., MARMON HOLDINGS, INC., CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, WATTS REGULATOR CO., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, CORNING INCORPORATED, ELLIOTT COMPANY, AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, ALFA LAVAL, INC., IMPERIAL CO., DAP, INC., MVS COMPANY and SULZER PUMPS (US), INC.
Cross Claimant: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO., BW/IP, INC., OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC., RCH NEW CO., II LLC, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES, INC., CLEAVER-BROOKS, CBS CORPORATION, ABB, INC., PENTAIR VALVES & CONTROLS, LLC, GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., ATLAS INDUSTRIES, INC., EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SIMAKAS COMPANY, INC., M.V.S. COMPANY, MUELLER CO., LLC, W.W. GRAINGER, INC., COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP., POWER PIPING COMPANY, MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY, FLSMIDTH DORR-OLIVER, INC., EICHLEAY CORPORATION, AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC., ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION, HUNTER SALES CORPORATION, JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC., FMC CORPORATION, INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, DICK CORPORATION, CROSBY VALVE, LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, DEZURIK, INC., ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC., CAMPBELL HAUSFELD, LLC, BRYAN STEAM, LLC, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLSMIDTH, INC., UB WEST VIRGINIA, INC., HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC., GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC., THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER LLC, BAKER HUGHES, FLOWSERVE US INC., CASHCO, INC., Trumbull Industries, Inc. and The Gage Company, formerly known as The Gage Company, formerly known as Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00879
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Referring Judge: Marilyn J Horan
2 Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1188 ORDER FOR CLARIFICATION/MODIFICATION re #1187 Report and Recommendation: In the Report and Recommendation, it is recommended that Gardner Denver's motion for summary judgment be denied, and in the body of the Report, it is recommended that Gardner Denver's motion for summary judgment be granted. This serves as a clarification to that discrepancy, and it is recommended that Gardner Denver's motion for summary judgment be GRANTED and the #1187 Recommendation at p.8 is modified to reflect that correction. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/10/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajs)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending re #1052 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by VIKING PUMP, INC., #1010 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment based upon Lack of Product Identification filed by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC., #1063 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, #1030 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLYDE UNION, INC., #1049 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC., #1027 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, #1046 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DCo LLC (f/k/a Dana Companies LLC), #1044 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, #1015 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., #1067 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEZURIK, INC., #1079 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC., #1025 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by HONEYWELL, INC., #983 MOTION for Summary Judgment based upon Lack of Product Identification filed by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC., #1024 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, #1084 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BW/IP, INC., #1073 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Product Identification filed by ALFA LAVAL, INC., #1074 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Product Identification filed by FMC CORPORATION, #1051 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC., #985 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #1076 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GARDNER DENVER, INC., and #1085 MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted in part and denied in part as more fully set forth herein. Objections to R&R due by 11/23/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/9/2021. (ajs)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Nicholas J. Koch terminated. (Koch, Nicholas)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to The Nash Engineering Company by THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 ORDER granting re #1004 Motion to Withdraw filed by FOSTER WHEELER LLC, #1149 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss filed by DARLENE DATA, and #1150 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss filed by DARLENE DATA and as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/20/2021. (ajt)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 TEXT ORDER: The video status conference scheduled for 7/28/2021 at 10:00AM is canceled. See ECF Nos. 992 and 1110 . Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/20/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 REPLY BRIEF re #1134 Response in Opposition, filed by ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.. (Krauth, Daniel)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 REPLY BRIEF re #988 Errata, IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Smith, Zachary)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 RESPONSE to Motion re #1149 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily as to Campbell Hausfeld, LLC, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Columbus McKinnon, DAP, Inc., n/k/a La Miranda Products Co., Inc., Eaton Corporation, Eichleay Corporation, Elliott Company, Emerson Climate Technol, #1000 MOTION for Summary Judgment Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.. (Selep, Joseph)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 REPLY BRIEF re #1030 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CLYDE UNION, INC.(individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), CLYDE UNION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lamperski, Vincent)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 REPLY BRIEF to Plaintiffs Response to Amended Motion for Summary Judgment based upon Lack of Product Identification filed by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Cuddy, Daniel)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 REPLY BRIEF re #1148 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, #1125 Response in Opposition, to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by VIKING PUMP, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 REPLY BRIEF re #1148 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, #1128 Response in Opposition,, to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. (Watson, Jennifer)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 REPLY BRIEF re #1148 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, #1126 Response in Opposition,, to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DCo LLC (f/k/a Dana Companies LLC). (Watson, Jennifer)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1174 REPLY BRIEF re #1148 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, #1123 Response in Opposition,,, to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1015 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1016 Brief in Support of Motion for Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.. (Waldinger, Ashley)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 REPLY to Response to Motion re #955 Brief in Support of Motion, #954 Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant Cameron International Corporation, f/k/a Cooper Cameron Corporation's Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. 1122]. filed by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Koch, Nicholas)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US, INC., SOLELY AS SUCCESSOR TO NORDSTROM AUDCO, INC., EDWARD VALVES, INC., NORDSTROM VALVES, INC. AND ROCKWELL MANUFACTURING to #1148 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, #989 Brief in Support of Motion, #985 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pennsylvania Power Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 - Flowserve Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit 3 - Depo of David Osborne dtd. 5-3-2016, #4 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 REPLY BRIEF re #1063 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 REPLY BRIEF re #1074 Motion for Summary Judgment, Based on Lack of Product Identification filed by FMC CORPORATION. (Arnold, Christopher)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 REPLY BRIEF re #1073 Motion for Summary Judgment, Based on Lack of Product Identification filed by ALFA LAVAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Moore depo in Wineland, #2 Exhibit B - Moore depo in Cundiff) (Arnold, Christopher)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 REPLY in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment to #1079 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1081 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.. (Welter, Joseph)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 REPLY BRIEF to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment for Lack of Product Identification filed by JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC. (Miller, Edward)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 REPLY BRIEF re #1120 Response in Opposition, to Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon Lack of Product Identification. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 ORDER granting #1160 Motion for Leave to File a Response to the Product Identification Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Flowserve US, Inc., solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Inc., Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. and Rockwell Manufacturing. Plaintiff's Response shall be due on or before July 1, 2021 with Defendants' Reply Briefs due on or before July 15, 2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/29/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1163 Errata re #1081 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.. Reason for Correction: Affidavit of Darrel Libby was filed without notarization due to clerical error. (Welter, Joseph)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 REPLY BRIEF to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment for Lack of Product Identification filed by GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Miller, Edward)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 RESPONSE to Motion re #1149 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily as to Campbell Hausfeld, LLC, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Columbus McKinnon, DAP, Inc., n/k/a La Miranda Products Co., Inc., Eaton Corporation, Eichleay Corporation, Elliott Company, Emerson Climate Technol filed by EICHLEAY CORPORATION. (Krauth, Daniel)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 MOTION for Leave to File Response to the Product Identification Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Flowserve US, Inc., solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Inc., Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. and Rockwell Manufacturing by DARLENE DATA. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 RESPONSE to Motion re #1149 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily as to Campbell Hausfeld, LLC, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Columbus McKinnon, DAP, Inc., n/k/a La Miranda Products Co., Inc., Eaton Corporation, Eichleay Corporation, Elliott Company, Emerson Climate Technol and Motion to Dismiss Cross Claims of All Defendants filed by ZURN INDUSTRIES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Edward)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 RESPONSE to Motion re #1149 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily as to Campbell Hausfeld, LLC, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Columbus McKinnon, DAP, Inc., n/k/a La Miranda Products Co., Inc., Eaton Corporation, Eichleay Corporation, Elliott Company, Emerson Climate Technol and Motion to Dismiss Cross Claims of All Defendants filed by CARRIER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Edward)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Arnold on behalf of FMC CORPORATION. (Arnold, Christopher)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1156 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Arnold on behalf of ALFA LAVAL, INC.. (Arnold, Christopher)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Arnold on behalf of PNEUMO ABEX, LLC. (Arnold, Christopher)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 Alfa Laval Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Amended), Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution/Indemnity against ALL DEFENDANTS by ALFA LAVAL, INC.. (Lowery, Katherine) Modified on 6/28/2021 (jd).
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Doz on behalf of FMC CORPORATION. (Doz, Matthew)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Doz on behalf of ALFA LAVAL, INC.. (Doz, Matthew)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Doz on behalf of PNEUMO ABEX, LLC. (Doz, Matthew)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 MOTION to Dismiss Robbins & Myers, Inc. by DARLENE DATA. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily as to Campbell Hausfeld, LLC, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Columbus McKinnon, DAP, Inc., n/k/a La Miranda Products Co., Inc., Eaton Corporation, Eichleay Corporation, Elliott Company, Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. in its own right and as sii to Alco Valve Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Joy Global Surface Mining, Inc., Leeds & Northrup Co., Navistar, Inc., Reading Crane and Engineering Company, Research Cottrell, Inc., n/k/a AWT Air Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., f/k/a Square D Corp., Siemens Industry, Inc., Simakas Company, Union Carbide Corporation, United Conveyor Co., Zurn Industries, a/k/a Erie City Iron Works by DARLENE DATA. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 BRIEF in Opposition re #1052 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1030 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1079 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1084 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1074 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1041 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1076 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1085 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1010 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1063 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1049 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1027 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1046 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1044 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1015 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1067 Motion for Summary Judgment, #954 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1025 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1024 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1073 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1051 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSHA Workplace Exposure to Asbestos, #2 Exhibit 2 - Surgeon General Cancer and Chronic Lung Disease in the Workplace, #3 Exhibit 3 - EPA Guidance for Preventing Asbestos Disease) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.S AMENDED CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED UPON LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION to #1011 Concise Statement of Material Facts, filed by DARLENE DATA. (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1146 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC. to #1012 Brief in Support of Motion, #1010 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Depo of Robert Vietmeier dtd. 1-21-1998, #2 Exhibit 2 - Discovery Responses of DeZurik, #3 Exhibit 3 - Depo of Albert Libke dtd. 1-23-2003, #4 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 RESPONSE TO JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLCS CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS to #1042 Concise Statement of Material Facts, filed by DARLENE DATA. (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING LLC to #1043 Brief in Support of Motion, #1041 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pennsylvania Power Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 - Depo of Thomas J. Hemphill dtd. 3-4-1999, #3 Exhibit 3 - Joy Discovery Responses, #4 Exhibit 4 - Depo of Roger Allen Finnamore dtd. 8-19-2008, #5 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC.S CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS to #1077 Concise Statement of Material Facts, filed by DARLENE DATA. (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC. to #1078 Brief in Support of Motion, #1076 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Depo of John Kendall dtd. 3-4-2015, #2 Exhibit 2 - Depo of Thomas J. Hemphill dtd. 3-4-1999, #3 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATIONS CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION (CM/ECF DOCKET NO. 1074-2) to #1074 Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by DARLENE DATA. (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION to #1074 Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Depo of Thomas Gifford dtd 8.22.2007, #2 Exhibit 2 - Depo of Thomas Gifford dtd 5.18.2010, #3 Exhibit 3 - Depo. of Ed Allis dtd. 4-2-2004, #4 Exhibit 4 - Interrogatory Answers of FMC Corporation, #5 Exhibit 5 - Interrogatory Answers of Sterling Fluid Systems, #6 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT DEZURIKS CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT to #1069 Concise Statement of Material Facts, filed by DARLENE DATA. (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT DEZURIK, INC. to #1068 Brief in Support of Motion, #1067 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DeZurik Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 - Depo. of Albert Libke dtd. 1-23-2003, #3 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT BW/IP, INC.S CONCISE STATEMENT OF FACTS to #1088 Concise Statement of Material Facts, filed by DARLENE DATA. (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT BW/IP, INC. to #1084 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1086 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - BW-IP Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pennsylvania Power Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit 3 - Depo of Thomas Hemphill dtd. 3-4-1999, #4 Exhibit 4 - Depo of Frank Costanzo dtd. 7-21-1997, #5 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.S CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED UPON LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION to #1057 Concise Statement of Material Facts, filed by DARLENE DATA. (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC. to #1051 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1054 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pennsylvania Power Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 - Depo. of Samuel Shields dtd. 12-29-2004, #3 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALFA LAVALS CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION (CM/ECF NO. 1073-2) to #1073 Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by DARLENE DATA. (McLeigh, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT ALFA LAVAL, INC. to #1073 Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Depo of John Roger dtd. 2-7-2008, #2 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL, INC. to #1025 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Depo. of Gregory Jack Thomas dtd. 1-21-2005, #2 Exhibit 2 - Honeywell, Inc. Answers to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 - Depo of Michael Chunko dtd 3-7-2000, #4 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT CLYDE UNION, INC. to #1031 Brief in Support of Motion, #1030 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Depo of Thomas J. Hemphill dtd. 3-4-1999, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pennsylvania Power Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit 3 - Clyde Union Discovery Responses, #4 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY to #1028 Brief in Support of Motion, #1027 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pennsylvania Power Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 - Powell Discovery Responses - Irrog No. 13, #3 Exhibit 3 - Powell Discovery Responses (1930s), #4 Exhibit 4 - Depo of William J. McClure dtd. 10-10-2006, #5 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. to #1044 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1045 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Air & Liquid Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 - Depo of Terrence W. Kenney dtd. 7-5-2002, #3 Exhibit 3 - Depo of Martin Kraft dtd. 2-7-2007, #4 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT HYSTER-YALE GROUP to #1079 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1081 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Aff of Darryl Libby (Ex. V to MSJ), #2 Exhibit 2 - Depo of Darrel Libby dtd. 3-10-2010, #3 Exhibit 3 - Allied Signal Answers to Interrogatories 1, #4 Exhibit 4 - Allied Signal Answers to Interrogatories 2, #5 Exhibit 5 - Depo of Eugene Rogers dtd. 5-11-1983, #6 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT DCO LLC (F/K/A/ DANA COMPANIES LLC) to #1047 Brief in Support of Motion, #1046 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dana Answers to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2 - Victor Gasket - 1970 Hard Gasket Engineering Reference Manual, #3 Exhibit 3 - Compressed Asbestos Sheet Packing and Steel Reinforced Composite Materials, #4 Exhibit 4 - Depo of Gary Austin dtd. 9-16-2003, #5 Exhibit 5 - Depo of Gary Austin dtd. 9-26-2003, #6 Exhibit 6 - What Will Replace Asbestos Gaskets, #7 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT VIKING PUMP, INC. to #1052 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1053 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pennsylvania Power Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 - Viking Pump Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit 3 - Depo of Thomas J. Hemphill dtd. 3-4-1999, #4 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY to #1063 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1066 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - GE Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 - General Electric Technical Information for Turbines, #3 Exhibit 3 - Baumgardner Affidavit to General Electric Bates Docs, #4 Exhibit 4 - General Electric Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - General Electric Technical Letter - Turbines with Asbestos, #6 Exhibit 6 - Depo. of David R. Skinner dtd. 8-25-2009, #7 Exhibit 7 - Pennsylvania Power Discovery Responses, #8 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT I.U.N.A. NORTH AMERICA, INC., AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST BY MERGER TO THE GARP COMPANY, FORMERLY KNOWN AS THE GAGE COMPANY, FORMERLY KNOWN AS PITTSBURGH GAGE AND SUPPLY COMPANY to #1049 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1050 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Gage Co. Responses to Master Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2 - Gage Catalog 20, #3 Exhibit 3 - 1965 Gage Catalog, #4 Exhibit 4 - Depo of Joseph Dawgiello dtd. 5-13-1987, #5 Exhibit 5 - Depo of Roy Whittaker dtd. 8-1-1994, #6 Exhibit 6 - Garlock Packing Material Catalog, #7 Exhibit 7 - Depo of George McKillip dtd 2-22-2007, #8 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION to #955 Brief in Support of Motion, #954 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Depo of Thomas J. Hemphill dtd. 3-4-1999, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pennsylvania Power Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cameron Discovery Responses in Data, #4 Exhibit 4 - Cameron Discovery Responses (Prior Case), #5 Exhibit 5 - Depo of Everette Johnson dtd. 1-10-2008, #6 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. to #1015 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1016 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Penn Power Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 - Depo of Thomas Grubka dtd. 12-10-08, #3 Exhibit 3 - Armstrong Steam Trap Book, Catalog L-4A, #4 Exhibit 4 - Armstrong Steam Trap Book, A Catalog and Educational Handbook, #5 Exhibit 5 - Armstrong Steam Trap Book K-II-3, #6 Exhibit 6 - Depo. of Thomas Grubka dtd. 5-29-2008, #7 Exhibit 7 - Depo of Thomas Grubka dtd. 12-16-2004, #8 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY to #1087 Brief in Support of Motion, #1085 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Clark Equipment Response to Discovery, #2 Exhibit 2 - Clark Equipment MSDS Sheet, #3 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY to #1026 Brief in Support of Motion, #1024 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Depo. of David Nash dtd 6-22-2012, #2 Exhibit 2 - Nash Engineering Discovery Responses, #3 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #1116 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Ryan, David)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 BRIEF in Support re #1116 Motion for Summary Judgment . (Ryan, David)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ryan, David)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 TEXT ORDER granting #1113 READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY's Motion for Leave to File summary judgment as to product identification Defendant Summary Judgment due by 6/18/2021; Response to Summary Judgment due by 7/19/2021; Replies due by 8/2/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/15/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Claim by DARLENE DATA re #971 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,, Order on Report and Recommendations,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Petition) (Shipp, Jason)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for leave of court to file product identification motion for summary judgment by READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Ryan, David)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 ORDER granting #1111 Motion to Dismiss Defendant AURORA PUMPS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Aurora Pumps are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, with each side bearing its own costs. This Order applies only to Defendant Aurora Pumps. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/27/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 MOTION to Dismiss Aurora Pumps by DARLENE DATA. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 TEXT ORDER granting #1109 Motion to Modify. The 992 Case Management Order is modified as follows: Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motions for summary judgment by 6/16/2021. Reply briefs by 6/30/2021. All other deadlines remain stayed until further Order of Court and the pending motions for summary judgment will be held in abeyance until ripe. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/13/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 Joint MOTION to Modify Summary Judgement Deadlines in 992 Case Management Order,,, by DARLENE DATA. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Motion Hearing held on April 29, 2021 before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Court Reporter Sharon Siatkowski, Telephone number 412-773-3623. Tape Number: ssiatkowski.usdc@outlook.com. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/17/2021. Redaction Request due 6/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (sls) Modified on 5/18/2021 (jd).
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 TEXT ORDER denying #993 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's #971 March 24, 2021 Memorandum and Order, for the reasons stated on the record at the motion hearing held on 4/29/2021. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/29/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rtw)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2021 re Plaintiff's #993 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's #971 March 24, 2021 Memorandum and Order. Argument heard on Motion. For the reasons stated on the record the Court orally denies the motion for reconsideration. (Court Reporter: Sharon Siatkowski) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rtw)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 NOTICE of Change of Address by Melissa Devich Cochran (Cochran, Melissa)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 NOTICE of Settlement (Busatto, Max)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS of Simakas Company, Inc. re Motion for Summary Judgment re #1102 Errata. (O'Connell, Edward)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 Errata re Quality Control message - No signature s/, by SIMAKAS COMPANY, INC.. Reason for Correction: Filer signature. (O'Connell, Edward)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 Errata re Quality Control message - No signature s/, by SIMAKAS COMPANY, INC.. Reason for Correction: Filer Signature. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Connell, Edward)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 Errata re #1064 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment - Statement of Undisputed Facts by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.. Reason for Correction: Signatures on documents and filer did not match.. (Lejeune, Peter)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 Errata re 1059 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.. Reason for Correction: Signatures on documents and filer did not match.. (Lejeune, Peter)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 Errata re 1056 Motion for Summary Judgment by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.. Reason for Correction: Signatures on documents and filer did not match.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lejeune, Peter)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1051 Motion for Summary Judgment. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (jd)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 1056 Motion for Summary Judgment. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (jd)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1064 Brief in Support of Motion, 1059 Brief in Support of Motion. ERROR: Signatures on BOTH documents and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (jd)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1075 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1074 Motion for Summary Judgment,. ERROR: Document should have been filed as separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Filer advised to file Memorandums in Support as Separate Entries and to also File the Concise Statements of Material Facts as separate entries. ACTION REQUIRED (jd)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 1089 Motion for Summary Judgment, 1090 Brief in Support of Motion. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (jd)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 BRIEF in Support re #1097 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DAP, Inc.. (Watson, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DAP, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Watson, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #1094 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1095 Brief in Support of Motion by ELLIOTT COMPANY. (Arthur, Aaron)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 BRIEF in Support re #1094 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ELLIOTT COMPANY. (Arthur, Aaron)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ELLIOTT COMPANY. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Arthur, Aaron)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #1091 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Sinclair, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 BRIEF in Support re #1091 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Navistar, Inc.. (Sinclair, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Navistar, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sinclair, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 BRIEF in Support re #1089 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SIMAKAS COMPANY, INC.. (O'Connell, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Simakas Company, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Service Order) (O'Connell, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #1084 Motion for Summary Judgment by BW/IP, INC.. (Turlik, John)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 BRIEF in Support re #1085 Motion for Summary Judgment filed on behalf of Clark Equipment Company. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 BRIEF in Support re #1084 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by BW/IP, INC.. (Turlik, John)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BW/IP, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Turlik, John)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 BRIEF in Support re #1080 Motion for Summary Judgment of Zurn Industries, LLC. (Miller, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS of Zurn Industries, LLC re #1080 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Miller, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 BRIEF in Support re #1079 Motion for Summary Judgment (with Affidavit of Darrel Libby) filed by HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.. (Welter, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Zurn Industries, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 MOTION for Summary Judgment by HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Welter, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 BRIEF in Support re #1076 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Miller, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #1076 Motion for Summary Judgment by GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Miller, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GARDNER DENVER, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Lowery, Katherine)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Product Identification by FMC CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support, #2 Supplement Concise Statement of Material Facts, #3 Proposed Order) (Lowery, Katherine)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Product Identification by ALFA LAVAL, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support, #2 Supplement Concise Statement of Material Facts, #3 Proposed Order) (Lowery, Katherine)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Leeds & Northrup. (Schaper, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 BRIEF in Support re #1070 Motion for Summary Judgment Leeds & Northrup. (Schaper, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 MOTION for Summary Judgment Leeds & Northrup. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schaper, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #1068 Brief in Support of Motion, #1067 Motion for Summary Judgment by DEZURIK, INC.. (Schaper, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 BRIEF in Support re #1067 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DEZURIK, INC.. (Schaper, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEZURIK, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schaper, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 BRIEF in Support re #1063 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS and Exhibit Appendix by EICHLEAY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Krauth, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 BRIEF in Support re #1056 Motion for Summary Judgment Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.. (Lejeune, Peter)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neft, Bryan)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 BRIEF in Support re #1061 Motion for Summary Judgment and Proposed Order filed by EICHLEAY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Krauth, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EICHLEAY CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Krauth, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 BRIEF in Support re #1055 Motion for Summary Judgment of Carrier Corporation. (Miller, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 BRIEF in Support re #1056 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.. (Lejeune, Peter)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS of Carrier Corporation re #1055 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Miller, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS and Exhibit Appendix by ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Krauth, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lejeune, Peter)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Carrier Corporation. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 BRIEF in Support re #1051 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Krauth, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 BRIEF in Support re #1052 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by VIKING PUMP, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 MOTION for Summary Judgment by VIKING PUMP, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Watson, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Krauth, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 BRIEF in Support re #1049 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 MOTION for Summary Judgment by I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Watson, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 Errata re #1018 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.(in its own right, and as successor-in-interest to I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company ). Reason for Correction: attachment. (Insco, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 BRIEF in Support re #1046 Motion for Summary Judgment by DCo LLC (f/k/a Dana Companies LLC). (Watson, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DCo LLC (f/k/a Dana Companies LLC). Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Watson, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 BRIEF in Support re #1044 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Watson, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 MOTION for Summary Judgment by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Watson, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 BRIEF in Support re #1041 Motion for Summary Judgment . (Miller, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #1041 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Miller, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 BRIEF in Support re #1039 Motion for Summary Judgment of Campbell Hausfeld. (Margolin, Erin)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Margolin, Erin)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by CATERPILLAR, INC.. (jd)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 BRIEF in Support re #1029 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CATERPILLAR, INC.. (jd)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 BRIEF in Support re #1035 Motion for Summary Judgment . (Margolin, Erin)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Margolin, Erin)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 BRIEF in Support re #1033 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. (Saunders, Tausha)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Saunders, Tausha)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1019 Motion for Summary Judgment,. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief In Support. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1020 Motion for Summary Judgment. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached, but filed as a separate entry at #1022 . CORRECTION: Attorney is advised that in the future, Proposed Orders and #1023 Certificates of Service should be filed as an attachment to the Motion (jd) Modified on 4/26/2021 (jd).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1029 Motion for Summary Judgment. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief In Support and Concise Statement of Material Facts. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1025 Motion for Summary Judgment. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. (jd)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 BRIEF in Support re #1019 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.. (jd)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order BRIEF in Support re #1017 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.(in its own right, and as successor-in-interest to I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company ). (jd)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 BRIEF in Support re #1030 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CLYDE UNION, INC.(individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), CLYDE UNION, INC.. (Lamperski, Vincent)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CLYDE UNION, INC.(individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), CLYDE UNION, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lamperski, Vincent)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CATERPILLAR, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Alexander, Tiffany)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 BRIEF in Support re #1027 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 MOTION for Summary Judgment by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smallwood, Edward)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 BRIEF in Support re #1024 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by HONEYWELL, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Santos, Eric)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 MOTION for Summary Judgment by THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smallwood, Edward)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION re #1020 Motion for Summary Judgment, #1021 Brief in Support of Motion, #1022 Proposed Order (Schaper, Joseph)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 Proposed Order re #1020 Motion for Summary Judgment by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 BRIEF in Support re #1020 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Schaper, Joseph)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 MOTION for Summary Judgment by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.(successor-by-merger to Lift Tech International, Inc., and its Shaw-Box Hoist Division ). Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Brief in Support) (Ward, Kevin)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 BRIEF in Support re #1017 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.(in its own right, and as successor-in-interest to I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company ). (Insco, James)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.(in its own right, and as successor-in-interest to I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company ). Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Insco, James)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 BRIEF in Support re #1015 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Waldinger, Ashley)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Waldinger, Ashley)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 BRIEF in Support re #1013 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION. (Sopher, Jeanne)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sopher, Jeanne)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 BRIEF in Support re #1010 Motion for Summary Judgment based upon Lack of Product Identification filed by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Cuddy, Daniel)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 Amended CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #1010 Motion for Summary Judgment by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Cuddy, Daniel)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment based upon Lack of Product Identification by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cuddy, Daniel)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1005 Motion for Summary Judgment. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 TEXT ORDER that a VIDEO Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's #993 Motion for Reconsideration is hereby set for 4/29/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Instructions on attending by video will be emailed to briefing counsel. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/22/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rtw)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 BRIEF in Support re #1005 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.. (Orszulak, Joseph)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS In Support of re #1005 Motion for Summary Judgment by RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.. (Orszulak, Joseph)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 MOTION for Summary Judgment based on Lack of Product Identification by RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Orszulak, Joseph)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment by FOSTER WHEELER LLC. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wolford, Dennis)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 REPLY to Response to Motion re #994 Brief in Support of Motion, #993 Motion for Reconsideration, #997 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by DARLENE DATA. (Shipp, Jason)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #1000 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Selep, Joseph)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 BRIEF in Support re #1000 Motion for Summary Judgment . (Selep, Joseph)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Selep, Joseph)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 999 Appendix to 998 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Affidavit of Michael Data, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - 190603 Deposition of Michael H. Data, Vol. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - 190604 Deposition of Michael H. Data, Vol. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - 190625 Deposition of Michael H. Data, Vol. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - 190627 Deposition of Michael H. Data, Vol. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - 190708 Deposition of Michael H. Data, Vol. 5, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - 190711 Deposition of Michael H. Data, Vol. 6, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - 190819 Deposition of Michael H. Data, Vol. 7, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - 190821 Deposition of Michael H. Data, Vol. 8, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - 020904 Deposition Excerpts of Richard Burgess, #11 Exhibit Ex. K - 020904 Deposition of Everett McGuire, #12 Exhibit Ex. L - 030109 Deposition of James Minner, #13 Exhibit Ex. M - 050121 Deposition of Gregory Thomas, #14 Exhibit Ex. N - 050323 Deposition of David Cain, #15 Exhibit Ex. O - 131205 Deposition of Jack Shaw, #16 Exhibit Ex. P - 131205 Deposition of Jack Shaw - Volume 1, #17 Exhibit Ex. Q - 131206 Deposition of Jack Shaw - Volume 2, #18 Exhibit Ex. R - 191104 Navy Records from JRG Asbestos Research and Report, #19 Exhibit Ex. S - Penn Power - Defendant's Document Production, #20 Exhibit Ex. T - 201106 Report of Arnold P. Moore, P.E, #21 Exhibit Ex. U - 210108 Report of Frank M. Parker, III, CIH, PE, BCEE) (McLeigh, Charles)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 998 TEXT ORDER granting #996 Motion for Leave to Redact Sensitive Information. A Joint Appendix for Motions for Summary Judgment and Responses shall be filed and sensitive information in the attached exhibits shall be redacted as outlined in the joint motion. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/19/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 997 BRIEF in Opposition re #983 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY. (jd)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #995 Response in Opposition. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 996 Joint MOTION Leave to Redact Sensitive Information by DARLENE DATA. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 995 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #993 Motion for Reconsideration,, filed by PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law (removed from Public View and refiled at #997 ) , #3 Certificate of Service) (McMeekin, John) Modified on 4/23/2021 (jd).
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 994 BRIEF in Support re #993 Motion for Reconsideration, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Shipp, Jason)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 993 MOTION for Reconsideration re #971 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,, Order on Report and Recommendations,,, by DARLENE DATA. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shipp, Jason)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 992 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Upon stipulation of the parties, summary judgment for lack of product identification due by 4/26/2021; Responses to summary judgment due by 5/26/2021; Reply brief due by 6/9/2021. All deadlines related to expert reports and discovery, all deadlines regarding the filing of motions for summary judgment on grounds other than lack of product identification are stayed until further Order of Court. Mediation pursuant to the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program shall occur within 30 days of the Court's decision on all motions for summary judgment for lack of product identification. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/12/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 991 Proposed Case Management Order Based Upon Post Discovery Status Conference of 21/04/07 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 990 NOTICE of Appearance. (Smith, Zachary)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #988 Errata. ERROR: Brief should have been filed as a separate document AS DESCRIBED at 04/07/2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #985 . CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed #989 BRIEF in Support re #985 Motion for Summary Judgment. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 989 BRIEF in Support re #985 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FLOWSERVE US INC.(solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Edward Valves Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company ). (jv)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 988 Errata re #985 Motion for Summary Judgment Reason for Correction: Separating Documents and Signatures on Documents. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Brief in Support of MSJ) (Smith, Zachary) Modified on 4/8/2021 to removed from public view attachment 2 since Court filed as #989 Brief in Support of Motion (jv).
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 986 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy: Post-Discovery Status Conference held on 4/7/2021, as more fully set forth in the attached entry. (Court Reporter: none) (cmc)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 985 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Zachary)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #983 Motion for Summary Judgment. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #985 Motion for Summary Judgment. ERROR: Typed name omitted/ MUST HAVE NAME TYPED ON LINE. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event., CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: ATTONEY ADVISED TO SEPARATE BRIEF IN SUPPORT FROM MOTION AND FILE AS A SEPARATE DOCUMENT. Clerk of Court docketed. ACTION REQUIRED (jd)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 987 BRIEF in Support re #983 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (jd)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 984 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #983 Motion for Summary Judgment by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Cuddy, Daniel)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 983 MOTION for Summary Judgment based upon Lack of Product Identification by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support) (Cuddy, Daniel)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 982 ORDER granting re #979 Motion to Dismiss filed by DARLENE DATA. As more fully set forth in the attached Order, the Defendants set forth herein are dismissed with prejudice, the pending motions for summary judgment at #937 and #974 are denied as moot, the motion for voluntary dismissal #976 is denied as moot and the Clerk's Office shall terminate the Defendants set forth in the Order from the docket. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/6/2021. (ajt)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 981 BRIEF in Support re #980 Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Evidence of Support of Product Identification filed by JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.. (Lamm, David)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 980 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Evidence of Support of Product Identification by JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Lamm, David)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 979 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily as to Defendants A.O. Smith Corporation, A.R. Wilfley & Sons, Inc., ABB, Inc., Acco Material Handling Solutions, AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc., Ahlstrom Pumps, LLC, Ajax Magnethermic Corporation, Allied Glove Corporation, American Cast Iron Pipe Company, Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Atlas Industries, Inc., Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC, Beazer East, Inc., BMI Refractory Services, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bryan Steam, LLC, Burnham, LLC, Carver Pump Company, Cashco, Inc., Caterpillar Global Mining America, LLC, Clark Reliance Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Corning, Inc. f/k/a Corhart Refractories, Crosby Valve, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., f/k/a Crown Cork & Seal Company (USA), Inc., as sii to Mundet Cork, Cummins, Inc., Dick Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc. as successor to Durametallic, Flowserve U.S., Inc. as successor to Durco/Duriron, Flowserve U.S., Inc. as successor to Valtek International, FLSMidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Gorman Rupp Company, Gould Electronics, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell LLC, Guard Line, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., f/k/a Wilputte Coke Oven, Howden North America f/k/a Howden Buffalo, Inc., Hunter Sales Corporation, Inductotherm Industries, Inc., Industrial Rubber Products, Johnson Controls, Inc., Kelsey-Hayes Company, Lindberg, Lindberg MPH, Mack Trucks, Inc., Magnetek, Inc., Marmon Holdings, Inc., McCarls, Inc., McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, LLC, McNeil (Ohio) Corporation, Met-Pro Corporation, Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Mine Safety Appliances, Minnotte Contracting Corporation, Morgan Engineering Systems, Inc., Moyno, Inc., Mueller Co., LLC, Mueller Steam Specialty, MVS Company, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Nagle Pumps, Inc., Nortek Global HVAC, LLC, North American Manufacturing Co., Osram Sylvania, Inc., Pecora Corporation, Pentair Valves & Controls, LLC, f/k/a Keystone Valves and Controls, Inc., Power Piping Co., PowerMaster Pacific Products, RCH Newco II, LLC, Reunion Industries, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Robinson Fans, Inc., Rust Engineering & Construction, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Sauer, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, Sunbeam Products, Inc., Sundyne, LLC, Surface Combustion, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Company, Trumbull Industries, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, UB West Virginia, Inc., United States Steel Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, W.W. Grainger, Inc., Washington Group International, Watson McDaniel Company, Watts Regulator Co., Weil McLain Company, Wheelabrator Air Pollution Control, Inc., WT/HRC Corporation, WTI Rust Holdings, Inc., York International Corporation, Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC, ONLY by DARLENE DATA. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 978 TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #976 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss: In light of Plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal seeking dismissal without prejudice of certain Defendants in this case, and Defendants having not joined in the motion and some having filed pending dispositive motions, it is HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants who are included in Plaintiff's motion file a joint omnibus response to Plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal by 4/9/2021. Alternatively, Plaintiff may amend her motion to dismissal with prejudice by 4/6/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/2/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 977 NOTICE of Appearance. (Cuddy, Daniel)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 976 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily as to Defendants A.O. Smith Corporation, A.R. Wilfley & Sons, Inc., ABB, Inc., Acco Material Handling Solutions, AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc., Ahlstrom Pumps, LLC, Ajax Magnethermic Corporation, Allied Glove Corporation, American Cast Iron Pipe Company, Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Atlas Industries, Inc., Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC, Beazer East, Inc., BMI Refractory Services, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Bryan Steam, LLC, Burnham, LLC, Carver Pump Company, Cashco, Inc., Caterpillar Global Mining America, LLC, Clark Reliance Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Corning, Inc. f/k/a Corhart Refractories, Crosby Valve, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., f/k/a Crown Cork & Seal Company (USA), Inc., as sii to Mundet Cork, Cummins, Inc., Dick Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc. as successor to Durametallic, Flowserve U.S., Inc. as successor to Durco/Duriron, Flowserve U.S., Inc. as successor to Valtek International, FLSMidth Dorr-Oliver, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Gorman Rupp Company, Gould Electronics, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Grinnell LLC, Guard Line, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., f/k/a Wilputte Coke Oven, Howden North America f/k/a Howden Buffalo, Inc., Hunter Sales Corporation, Inductotherm Industries, Inc., Industrial Rubber Products, Johnson Controls, Inc., Kelsey-Hayes Company, Lindberg, Lindberg MPH, Mack Trucks, Inc., Magnetek, Inc., Marmon Holdings, Inc., McCarls, Inc., McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McNally Industries, LLC, McNeil (Ohio) Corporation, Met-Pro Corporation, Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Mine Safety Appliances, Minnotte Contracting Corporation, Morgan Engineering Systems, Inc., Moyno, Inc., Mueller Co., LLC, Mueller Steam Specialty, MVS Company, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Nagle Pumps, Inc., Nortek Global HVAC, LLC, North American Manufacturing Co., Osram Sylvania, Inc., Pecora Corporation, Pentair Valves & Controls, LLC, f/k/a Keystone Valves and Controls, Inc., Power Piping Co., PowerMaster Pacific Products, RCH Newco II, LLC, Reunion Industries, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Robinson Fans, Inc., Rust Engineering & Construction, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Sauer, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, Sunbeam Products, Inc., Sundyne, LLC, Surface Combustion, Inc., Swindell-Dressler International Company, Trumbull Industries, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, UB West Virginia, Inc., United States Steel Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, W.W. Grainger, Inc., Washington Group International, Watson McDaniel Company, Watts Regulator Co., Weil McLain Company, Wheelabrator Air Pollution Control, Inc., WT/HRC Corporation, WTI Rust Holdings, Inc., York International Corporation, Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC by DARLENE DATA. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 975 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 974 MOTION for Summary Judgment by HONEYWELL, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service) (Santos, Eric)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 973 NOTICE of Appearance. (Reilly, Patrick)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 972 NOTICE of Appearance. (Margolin, Erin)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 971 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER adopting in part, and rejecting in part, the #953 Report and Recommendation dated February 11, 2021, as stated in Opinion. Penn Power's #801 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1), is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Penn Power's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED, without prejudice. Penn Power's Motion is GRANTED as to the alternative request for a stay of the proceedings. IT IS ORDERED that all proceedings as to Penn Power are hereby STAYED pending administrative resolution of Plaintiff's claim under the Occupational Disease Act. Alfa Laval's #830 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is DENIED. This matter is returned to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/24/21. (rtw)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 970 REPLY to Plaintiff's Opposition to the Objections of Defendant Pennsylvania Power Company to #953 Report and Recommendation,, filed by PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY. (McMeekin, John)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 969 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #959 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Shipp, Jason)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 968 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #958 Objections, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Shipp, Jason)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 967 ORDER granting #964 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew F. Adomitis terminated. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/4/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 966 ORDER granting #963 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew F. Adomitis terminated. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/4/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 965 ORDER granting #962 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew F. Adomitis terminated. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/4/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 964 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.( in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ). Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Adomitis, Andrew)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 963 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CLYDE UNION, INC.(individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), CLYDE UNION, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Adomitis, Andrew)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 962 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CLEAVER-BROOKS. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Adomitis, Andrew)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 961 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica T. Holland on behalf of WEIL-MCLAIN COMPANY. (Holland, Monica)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 960 NOTICE of Change of Address by Melissa Devich Cochran (Cochran, Melissa)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 959 OBJECTIONS to #953 Report and Recommendation . (Lowery, Katherine)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 958 OBJECTIONS to #953 Report and Recommendation, by PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McMeekin, John)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 957 BRIEF in Support re #956 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by SULZER PUMPS (US), INC. (jd)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 956 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SULZER PUMPS (US), INC.. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant Sulzer Pumps Solutions Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Order) (Hutchinson, Jenna)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 955 BRIEF in Support re #954 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Koch, Nicholas)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 954 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Koch, Nicholas)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 953 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending #801 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY and #830 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ALFA LAVAL, INC. be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/11/2021. (ajt)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Marilyn J. Horan presiding. Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy referred. (nll)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #950 Notice of Change of Address, #952 Notice of Change of Address, #945 Notice of Change of Address. ERROR: unnecessary filing. CORRECTION: Filer advised in the future, this is not a necessary filing, but to only change their address in their own accounts. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy no longer presiding in case. (nll)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 952 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelly L Smith (Smith, Kelly)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 951 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelly L Smith (Smith, Kelly)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 950 NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward A. Smallwood (Smallwood, Edward)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 949 NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward A. Smallwood (Smallwood, Edward)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 948 NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward A. Smallwood (Smallwood, Edward)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 947 NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward A. Smallwood (Smallwood, Edward)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 946 NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward A. Smallwood (Smallwood, Edward)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 945 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven D. Evans (Evans, Steven)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 944 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven D. Evans (Evans, Steven)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 943 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven D. Evans (Evans, Steven)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 941 BRIEF in Support re #938 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jd)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 940 BRIEF in Support re #937 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GREENE TWEED & COMPANY. (jd)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 939 TEXT ORDER: In light of the court's 929 Case Management Order, all responses to motions for summary judgment related to product identification are due by 5/12/2021. At that time, Plaintiff may file an omnibus response brief to all pending motions. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/9/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #937 Motion for Summary Judgment, #938 Motion for Summary Judgment. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed both as Brief in Support. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 938 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC by FOSTER WHEELER LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of MSJ, #2 Proposed Order) (Wolford, Dennis)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 937 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Behalf of Greene Tweed & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of MSJ, #2 Proposed Order) (Wolford, Dennis)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 936 ORDER granting #935 Motion to Withdraw Appearance by Melissa D. Cochran on behalf of ACCO MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTION, INC. Attorney Melissa D. Cochran terminated. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/8/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 935 MOTION to Withdraw Appearance by ACCO MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTION, INC.. (Cochran, Melissa)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 934 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis J. Stanek on behalf of ACCO MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTION, INC.. (Stanek, Francis)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 933 ORDER granting #930 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of American Cast Iron Pipe Company. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that American Cast Iron Pipe Company is hereby dismissed from this action in its entirety and with prejudice. Each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/29/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 932 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ruth on behalf of WEIL-MCLAIN COMPANY. (Ruth, Melissa)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 931 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ruth on behalf of GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Ruth, Melissa)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 930 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Clements, Scott)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 929 ORDER granting #928 Motion to Modify Certain Deadlines in the Case Management Order. ADR Stipulation due 3/31/2021; Fact Discovery due 3/31/2021; Plaintiff's notice of intention to voluntarily dismiss any party due 3/31/2021; Motions for Summary Judgment on product identification due 4/12/2021, with Responses due 5/12/2021 and Replies due 5/19/2021; Expert Reports due 6/15/2021; Rebuttal Expert Reports due 7/15/2021; Remaining Motions for Summary Judgment due 6/15/2021, with Responses due 7/12/2021 and Replies due 7/19/2021. The Post-Discovery Status Conference is rescheduled to 4/7/2021 at 10:00 A.M. by Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy, and the Post-Expert Discovery Status Conference is rescheduled to 7/28/2021 at 10:00 A.M. by Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. All other deadlines set forth in the Case Management Order of 5/29/2020 (ECF 707) remain in effect. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/26/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Post-Expert Discovery Status Conference set for 7/28/2021 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/7/2021 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. (cmc)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 928 Joint MOTION to Modify Certain Deadlines in Case Management Order #924 Corrective Entry, #707 Case Management Order,,, #923 Order on Motion to Modify,, by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 927 TEXT ORDER approving re #926 Stipulation of Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION IS HEREBY DISMISSED with prejudice as to all claims and causes of action filed against Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., with each party bearing her and its own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/4/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 926 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Crown Cork & Seal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rogers, William)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 925 NOTICE of Appearance, on behalf of North American Manufacturing Company (Waldinger, Ashley) Modified on 12/21/2020 to add represented party (jd).
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 924 CORRECTIVE ENTRY re #923 Order on Motion to Modify: Order missing signature; corrected version attached. (cmc)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 923 ORDER granting #922 Motion to Modify Certain Deadlines in ECF 707 Case Management Order. ADR Stipulation due 2/1/2021; Fact Discovery due 2/1/2021; Expert Reports due 3/1/2021; Rebuttal Expert Reports due 4/1/2021; Motions for Summary Judgment due 4/15/2021; Response to Motions for Summary Judgment due 5/12/2021; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 10:00 a.m. by Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Post-Expert Discovery Status Conference set for 4/7/2021 at 10:00 a.m. by Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/25/2020. (cmc)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings: Discovery due by 2/1/2021; Expert Discovery to be completed by 4/1/2021; Summary Judgment due by 4/15/2021; Response to Summary Judgment due by 5/12/2021; Post-Expert Discovery Status Conference set for 4/7/2021 10:00 AM by Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. (cmc)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 922 Joint MOTION to Modify Certain Deadlines in Modified Case Management Order #707 Case Management Order,,,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neft, Bryan)
November 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 921 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to Defendant Mallinckrodt US Holdings LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Debtors) (Helbling, Jill)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 920 NOTICE of Service of Discovery (Baranyai, Bridget)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 919 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Armstrong International, Inc.'s Objections and Answers to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, Responses to Requests for Admission and Responses to Requests for Production of Documents by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Wiese, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 918 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answers to Interrogatories, Response to Requests for Admissions, and Response to Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant North American Manufacturing Company by NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO. (Waldinger, Ashley)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 917 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Doz on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Allied Corporation (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Allied Chemical (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Wilputte Coke Oven Corporation ). (Doz, Matthew)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #918 Certificate of Service,. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. This message is for informational purposes only., CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: DISCOVERY IS NOT TO BE FILED EXCEPT BY ORDER OF THE COURT. CORRECTION: in the future, please do not file discovery. This message is for informational purposes only. NO ACTION REQUIRED (jd)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 916 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Mueller Co. LLC. (Zietak, Danielle) Modified on 10/29/2020 to add party (jd).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 915 NOTICE of Appearance, on behalf of CROSBY VALVE, LLC. (Zietak, Danielle) Modified on 10/29/2020 to add party (jd).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 914 NOTICE of Appearance, Pentair Valves & Controls. LLC, f/k/a Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc., n/k/a Vulsub II, LLC, (Zietak, Danielle) Modified on 10/29/2020 to add party (jd).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 913 NOTICE of Appearance. Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. (incorrectly sued as Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., in its own right and as successor in interest to Alco Valve Company) (Zietak, Danielle) Modified on 10/29/2020 to add party (jd).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 912 TEXT ORDER granting #911 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Hugh McKeegan terminated. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/28/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 911 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Hugh McKeegan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ross, Michael)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 910 Errata re #909 Notice of Discovery Responses to Plaintiff by MUELLER CO., LLC. Reason for Correction: wrong document attached. (Selep, Joseph)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 909 NOTICE of Discovery Responses to Plaintiff by MUELLER CO., LLC (Selep, Joseph)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 908 NOTICE of Appearance. (Smith, Zachary)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 907 STIPULATED ORDER granting #906 Motion for Protective Order.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/29/2020. (cmc)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 906 MOTION for Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service) (Gilmartin, Robert)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 905 REPLY BRIEF re #891 Response in Opposition to Alfa Laval's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Lowery, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 904 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to the motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant ot F.R.C.P 12(b) (1) filed by PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY. (McMeekin, John)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #903 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 9/15/2020. (jd)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 903 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by SULZER PUMPS SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Hutchinson, Jenna)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint and CROSSCLAIMS against all defts and third party defts, by MESTEK, INC. (Hutchinson, Jenna) Modified text on 9/9/2020. (tt)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 901 AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc., f/k/a URS Energy & Construction, Inc., f/k/a Catalytic Construction Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Cummins, Inc., DAP, Inc., DCo LLC, f/k/a Dana Companies, LLC, I.U. North America, Inc., as successor by merger to The Garp Company, f/k/a The Gage Company, f/k/a Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Company, McCarls, Inc., Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. n/k/a Milwaukee Valve Company, LLC, RCH Newco II, LLC, formerly known as Robertson Ceco Corporation, an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company, Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., f/k/a Norton Company, Viking Pump, Inc., and ZF Active Safety US Inc. f/k/a Kelsey-Hayes Company's Omnibus ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Crossclaims, and CROSSCLAIM s against All Defendants by CUMMINS, INC., AECOM CONSTRUCTION, INC., AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DAP, INC, I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC., DANA COMPANIES, LLC, MCCARLS, INC., MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, RCH NEW CO. II LLC, SAINT-GOVAIN ABRASIVES, INC., VIKING PUMP, INC., KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY . (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 9/3/2020 (jd).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 900 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint and Crossclaims by ELLIOTT COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, GRINNELL, LLC, ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Arthur, Aaron)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 899 ORDER granting #898 Motion for Leave to File Answers and Affirmative Defenses Out of Time by ELLIOTT COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, GRINNELL, LLC, ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. Moving Defendants shall file an omnibus answer forthwith. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/1/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 898 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Answers and Affirmative Defenses Out of Time by ELLIOTT COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, GRINNELL, LLC, ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Arthur, Aaron)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 897 ANSWER to Complaint #773 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MESTEK, INC.. (Fiorilli, Mark)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ANSWER to Complaint #773 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BEAZER EAST, INC.(in its own right and as successor to Koppers Co., Inc., and other related companies, including Thiem Corporation, Beazer USA, Inc., and Beazer, PLC ). (Fiorilli, Mark)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 895 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by SPIRAX SARCO, INC.. (Busatto, Max)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 894 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION(and its division Jerguson Gage and Valve ). (Busatto, Max)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 893 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC.. (Busatto, Max)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 892 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Responses by SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY (Lowery, Katherine)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 891 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #830 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Shipp, Jason)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 890 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #801 Motion to Dismiss, filed by DARLENE DATA. (Shipp, Jason)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 889 Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Changed text to read CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 888 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option,. (Vey, Paul)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 887 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option,. (Lamm, David)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 886 ANSWER to Complaint Amended by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 885 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC.. (Warhola, Adam)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 884 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by NAGLE PUMPS, INC.. (Warhola, Adam)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 883 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by DICK CORPORATION. (Baranyai, Bridget)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 882 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC. (Noe Cerrone, Shannan)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 881 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.. (Noe Cerrone, Shannan)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 880 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by BAKER HUGHES. (Keating, Philip)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 879 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Polley, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #878 Notice. ERROR: DISCOVERY IS NOT TO BE FILED EXCEPT BY ORDER OF THE COURT. CORRECTION: DO NOT FILE DISCOVERY UNLESS ORDERED BY THE COURT. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd) (jd) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 878 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Responses by HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Arriaga, Alba)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 877 NOTICE of Service of Responses and OBjections to First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Prduction of Documents (Martin-O'Bryan, Kimberly)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 876 RESPONSE Notice of Response to Plaintiff Discovery Requests. (Selep, Joseph)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 875 RESPONSE Notice of Response to Plaintiff Discovery Requests filed by EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Selep, Joseph)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 874 RESPONSE Notice of Response to Plaintiff Discovery Requests. (Selep, Joseph)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #873 Notice, #872 Notice, #875 Response, #876 Response, #874 Response, #877 Notice. ERROR: DISCOVERY IS NOT TO BE FILED EXCEPT BY ORDER OF THE COURT. CORRECTION: DO NOT FILE DISCOVERY UNLESS ORDERED BY THE COURT. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 873 NOTICE of service of responses to plaintiffs discovery by REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC. (Gordon, Cathy)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 872 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Plaintiff's discovery by FOSTER WHEELER LLC (Wolford, Dennis)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 871 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CATERPILLAR, INC. re #870 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Alexander, Tiffany)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 870 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CATERPILLAR, INC.. (Alexander, Tiffany)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 869 Disclosure Statement identifying Siemens AG as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC.. (Singley, David)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 868 Disclosure Statement identifying Clean Harbors, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BRAND INSULATIONS, INC.. (Singley, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 867 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure of North American Manufacturing Company (Waldinger, Ashley)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 866 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (O'Connell, Edward)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 865 Errata re #848 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim Reason for Correction: Signature on document and filer did not match.. (O'Connell, Edward)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 864 Disclosure Statement identifying Tuthill Corp. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TUTHILL CORPORATION. (Chapman, Matthew)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 863 ANSWER to Complaint - Amended Complaint - Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Cross Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Scheuring, Gregory)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 862 ANSWER to Complaint - Amended Complaint - Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Cross Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Scheuring, Gregory)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 861 TEXT Order to Vacate re 860 Order for Consent/DJO form. Order entered in error. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/30/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 860 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 8/28/2020, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 8/28/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/29/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 859 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #830 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #801 Motion to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2020 Replies due by 9/11/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/29/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 858 BRIEF in Support re #830 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (jd)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 857 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Cross Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION. (Scheuring, Gregory)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 856 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Cross Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY. (Scheuring, Gregory)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Allied Corporation (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Allied Chemical (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Wilputte Coke Oven Corporation ). (Mroz, Kenneth)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 853 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CORNING INCORPORATED(on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories business division ). (Schollaert, John)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 852 ANSWER to #31 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 851 TEXT ORDER granting #803 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael A. Karaffa terminated. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/29/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #848 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 8/5/2020. (jd)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #830 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #811 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 8/5/2020. (jd)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #844 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 8/5/2020. (jd)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 850 ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 849 ANSWER to Complaint (AMENDED) AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLSMIDTH, INC.. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 848 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint Amended, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION. (O'Connell, Edward)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 847 ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.. (Ward, Kevin)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 846 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by ELLIOTT COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, GRINNELL, LLC, ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Arthur, Aaron)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ANSWER to Complaint by WATSON McDANIEL COMPANY. (English, Jason)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 844 ANSWER to Complaint by INDUSTRIAL RUBBER PRODUCTS. (English, Jason)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 843 ANSWER to Complaint by WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL(and all its domestic subsidiaries including The Badger Company, Inc. ). (English, Jason)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 842 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EATON CORPORATION(as successor-in-interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc.). (Margolin, Erin)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, and CROSSCLAIM for Contribution/Indemnity against All Defendants by W.W. GRAINGER, INC.. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 840 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, and CROSSCLAIM for Contribution/Indemnity against All Defendants by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, and CROSSCLAIM for Contribution/Indemnity against All Defendants by STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, and CROSSCLAIM for Contribution/Indemnity against All Defendants by SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 837 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ACCO MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTION, INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE US INC.(solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Edward Valves Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company ), GARDNER DENVER, INC., JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC, ZURN INDUSTRIES. (Miller, Edward)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 836 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, and CROSSCLAIM for Contribution/Indemnity against All Defendants by MCNALLY INDUSTRIES, LLC(in its own right and its Northern Pumps Division, in its own right ). (Lowery, Katherine)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 835 Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Mueller Co. LLC, Crosby Valve, LLC, and Pentair Valves & Controls, LLC, f/k/a Keystone Valves & Controls, Inc., n/k/a Vulsub II, LLC ANSWER to Complaint Omnibus Answer to Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM Answer to Cross Claims against All Parties by EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Selep, Joseph)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 834 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution/Indemnity against All Defendants by GUARD LINE, INC.. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 833 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, and CROSSCLAIM for Contribution/Indemnity against All Defendants by FMC CORPORATION. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 832 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, and CROSSCLAIM for Contribution/Indemnity against All Defendants by CARVER PUMP COMPANY. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CASHCO, INC., MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC, SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.(as success-in-interest to Sunbeam Corporation ). (Krescanko, Ryan)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 830 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ALFA LAVAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - Gay Decision, #4 Exhibit 2 - Sullivan Decision) (Lowery, Katherine)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 829 Pneumo Abex's ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, and CROSSCLAIM for Contribution/Indemnity against All Defendants by PNEUMO ABEX, LLC. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ABB, INC.(as successor to Brown Boveri (Individually and as successor-in-interest to ITE IMPERIAL CO f/k/a ITE CIRCUIT BREAKER COMPANY)), ACCO MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTION, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AHLSTROM PUMPS LLC, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION(successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION, ALFA LAVAL, INC., ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION, AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY, AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC, ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC., ATLAS INDUSTRIES, INC., ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC., AURORA PUMPS, BAKER HUGHES, BAKER HUGHES(a GE Company, LLC), BEAZER EAST, INC.(in its own right and as successor to Koppers Co., Inc., and other related companies, including Thiem Corporation, Beazer USA, Inc., and Beazer, PLC ), BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES, INC., BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, BRAND INSULATIONS, INC., BRYAN STEAM, LLC, BURNHAM LLC, BW/IP, INC., CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, CAMPBELL HAUSFELD, LLC, CARRIER CORPORATION, CARVER PUMP COMPANY, CASHCO, INC., CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING AMERICA, LLC, CATERPILLAR, INC., CBS CORPORATION(as Successor by Merger to CBS Corp.), CBS CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION(and its division Jerguson Gage and Valve ), CLEAVER-BROOKS, CLYDE UNION, INC.(individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), CLYDE UNION, INC., COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP., COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.(successor-by-merger to Lift Tech International, Inc., and its Shaw-Box Hoist Division ), CORNING INCORPORATED(on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories business division ), CORNING INCORPORATED, CRANE COMPANY, INC., CROSBY VALVE, LLC, CROWN CORK & SEAL USA, INC.(as sii to Mundet Cork ), CUMMINS, INC., DANA COMPANIES, LLC, DANIELI CORPORATION, DAP, INC., DARLENE DATA, MICHAEL DATA, DEZURIK, INC., DICK CORPORATION, DRAVO CORPORATION, EATON CORPORATION(as successor-in-interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc.), EATON CORPORATION, EICHLEAY CORPORATION, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY, EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.( in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Alco Valve Company ), EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE US INC.(solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Edward Valves Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company ), FLOWSERVE US INC.(successor to Valtek International ), FLSMIDTH DORR-OLIVER, INC.(as successor-in-interest to Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company ), FLSMIDTH, INC., FMC CORPORATION, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER LLC, GARDNER DENVER, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, GRINNELL, LLC, GUARD LINE, INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Allied Corporation (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Allied Chemical (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Wilputte Coke Oven Corporation ), HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(as successor-in-interest to the Bendix Corporation ), HONEYWELL, INC., HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., HUNTER SALES CORPORATION, HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC., I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.(as successor by merger to The Garp Company, formerly known as The Gage Company, formerly known as The Gage Company, formerly known as Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Company), IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., IMPERIAL CO., INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES, INC., INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INDUSTRIAL RUBBER PRODUCTS, INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION, ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC., JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC, KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY, LEEDS & NORTHRUP COMPANY, LINDBERG, LINDBERG MPH, M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC., MAGNETEK, INC., MALLINCKRODT US HOLDINGS, LLC, MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY(INCORRECTLY DESIGNATED AS WEIL-MCLAIN COMPANY), MARMON HOLDINGS, INC., MCCARLS, INC., MCMASTER CARR SUPPLY, MCNALLY INDUSTRIES, LLC(in its own right and its Northern Pumps Division, in its own right ), MCNALLY INDUSTRIES, LLC, MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION, MESTEK, INC., MET-PRO CORPORATION(and its Dean Pump brand), METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, MINE SAFETY APPLIANCE COMPANY, MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION, MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC., MOYNO, INC., MUELLER CO., LLC, M.V.S. COMPANY, MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY, MVS COMPANY, MACK TRUCKS, INC., MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC, NAGLE PUMPS, INC., NAVISTAR, INC., NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC(as successor by merger to Reznor, LLC ), NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO., OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.( in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ), PECORA CORPORATION, PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY, PENTAIR VALVES & CONTROLS, LLC, PNEUMO ABEX, LLC, PNEUMO ABEX, LLC (as successor-in-interest to Abex Corporation ), POWER PIPING COMPANY, POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS, RCH NEW CO., II LLC(an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company), READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY, RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC., REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC., RILEY POWER, INC., ROBBINS & MYERS, INC., ROBINSON FANS, INC., ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.(successor by merger to Allen Bradley Co), RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC., SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC., SAUER, INC., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.(in its own right, and as successor-in-interest to I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company ), SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC., SIMAKAS COMPANY, INC., SPIRAX SARCO, INC., SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC, SULZER PUMPS (US), INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.(as success-in-interest to Sunbeam Corporation ), SUNDYNE, LLC, SURFACE COMBUSTION, SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY, THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, TRANE U.S. INC.( in its own right and as successor to Westinghouse Airbrake and/or WABCO ), TRUMBELL INDUSTRIES, INC., TRUMBULL INDUSTRIES, INC., TUTHILL CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, VELAN VALVE CORPORATION, VIKING PUMP, INC., W.W. GRAINGER, INC., WARREN PUMPS, LLC, WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL(and all its domestic subsidiaries including The Badger Company, Inc. ), WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL, WATSON McDANIEL COMPANY, WATTS REGULATOR CO., WEIL-MCLAIN COMPANY, WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC., WT/HRC CORPORATION, WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC, ZURN INDUSTRIES by MACK TRUCKS, INC., UB WEST VIRGINIA, INC.. (Reilly, Patrick)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 827 Errata re #820 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.( in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ). Reason for Correction: Wrong document attached. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims of All Defedants against All Defendants by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims of All Defedants against All Defendants by BURNHAM LLC. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 824 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims of All Defedants against All Defendants by CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 823 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims of All Defedants against All Defendants by MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 822 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims of All Defedants against All Defendants by CLYDE UNION, INC.(individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), CLYDE UNION, INC.. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims of All Defedants against All Defendants by CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING AMERICA, LLC. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 820 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims of All Defedants against All Defendants by OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.( in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ). (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ANSWER to Complaint Amended (737) by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY. (Arriaga, Alba)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 818 Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by CAMPBELL HAUSFELD, LLC. (Gordon, Cathy)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 817 Answer to Amended Complaint w/Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Counterclaims ANSWER to Complaint by MALLINCKRODT US HOLDINGS, LLC. (Helbling, Jill)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 816 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) and Affirmative Defenses by DRAVO CORPORATION. (Gordon, Cathy)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 815 ANSWER to Complaint by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. (Saunders, Tausha)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 814 ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint , and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC.. (Singley, David)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC.. (Singley, David)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Singley, David)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint , and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BRAND INSULATIONS, INC.. (Singley, David)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 810 Omibus ANSWER to Complaint by BW/IP, INC.. (Turlik, John)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint and Affimative Defenses and Answer to All Crossclaims by CRANE COMPANY, INC.. (Ross, Michael)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.. (Gold, Mallory)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 807 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by EICHLEAY CORPORATION. (Gold, Mallory)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 806 ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to All Cross Claims against All Defendants by AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY. (Clements, Scott)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 805 ANSWER to Complaint , Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Koch, Nicholas)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 804 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HONEYWELL, INC.. (Santos, Eric)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 803 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Karaffa, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 802 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Co-Defendants' Crossclaims against All Defendants by MINE SAFETY APPLIANCE COMPANY. (Butcher, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 801 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY. (Chapman, Matthew)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 800 Disclosure Statement identifying OSRAM GmbH as corporate parent or other affiliate, by OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.( in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ). (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #786 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 798 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Evans, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 797 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 795 Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by BRYAN STEAM, LLC. (Mueller, William)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended), Affirmative Defenses and Cross-Claim by SAUER, INC.. (Vey, Paul)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 793 ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Arriaga, Alba)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended), Affirmative Defenses and Cross-Claims by JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.. (Lamm, David)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 791 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims of all other Defendants against All Defendants by UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION. (Sopher, Jeanne)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 790 Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to #82 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GREENE TWEED & COMPANY. (Wolford, Dennis)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 789 Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to #782 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FOSTER WHEELER LLC. (Wolford, Dennis)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ANSWER to Complaint AMENDED by FLOWSERVE US INC.(solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Edward Valves Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company ). (Crimarki, Christine)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 787 ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ALLEN-BRADLEY CO.S ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.(successor by merger to Allen Bradley Co). (Lejeune, Peter)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 786 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by MET-PRO CORPORATION(and its Dean Pump brand). (Chapman, Matthew)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 785 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by TUTHILL CORPORATION. (Chapman, Matthew)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint by CROWN CORK & SEAL USA, INC.(as sii to Mundet Cork ). (Rogers, William)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 783 Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by ATLAS INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Smith, Kelly)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 782 Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by HONEYWELL, INC.. (Smith, Donald)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 781 Magnetek, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint 773 Amended Complaint by MAGNETEK, INC.. (Witte, William)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint by RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.. (Orszulak, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 779 Errata re #778 Answer to Amended Complaint #773 by AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION. Reason for Correction: Signature did not match filing attorney. (Orszulak, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint by AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION. (Witte, William)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint Answer to All Crossclaims by INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Stanek, Francis)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Wimer, Matthew)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 775 Honeywell International Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(as successor-in-interest to the Bendix Corporation ). (Friedman, Julie)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 774 Riley Power Inc's ANSWER to #773 Amended Complaint by RILEY POWER, INC.. (Hogan, Robert)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 773 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants, filed by DARLENE DATA, EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL DATA, DECEASED,. (McLeigh, Charles)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 772 ORDER granting #770 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting #770 Motion to Substitute Party. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint forthwith. In light of the amended complaint, the motions to dismiss at ECF Nos. #39 and #428 are denied as moot without prejudice to reassert as to the amended complaint. Responsive pleadings due by 7/28/2020. To the extent that answers on behalf of several defendants are identical, and especially if several defendants are represented by the same counsel, those responsive pleadings shall be made by an omnibus filing. Additionally, to the extent that the amended complaint does not substantively change the need for amended crossclaims, the court will consider the previously filed crossclaims and answers to those crossclaims as active pleadings. Should any defendant seek to amend their crossclaim in light of the amended complaint, they shall file a motion to do so by 7/28/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/7/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 771 BRIEF in Support re #770 Motion for Leave to File, Motion to Substitute Party filed by DARLENE DATA, MICHAEL DATA. (McLeigh, Charles)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 770 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and, MOTION to Substitute Party by DARLENE DATA, MICHAEL DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (McLeigh, Charles)
July 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 769 REPLY to #737 Notice, filed by DARLENE DATA, MICHAEL DATA. (Shipp, Jason)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 768 Disclosure Statement identifying Columbus McKinnon Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.. (Ward, Kevin)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 767 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULE 26(a)(1) DISCLOSURE OF A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC. (Martin-O'Bryan, Kimberly)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 766 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosures by EICHLEAY CORPORATION (Gold, Mallory)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 765 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 (Disclosures) by ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC. (Gold, Mallory)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 764 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosure by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION (Lamperski, Vincent)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 763 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF WATTS REGULATOR CO.'S RULE 26 DISCLOSURES (Insco, James)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 762 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULE 26 DISCLOSURES (Insco, James) FILED BY SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC., INCORRECTLY DESIGNATED AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO I-T-E CIRCUIT BREAKERS . Modified on 7/1/2020, to add filer (jd).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 761 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (jd)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 760 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURE OF DRAVO LLC by DRAVO CORPORATION (Gordon, Cathy)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 759 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES, INC. (Stanek, Francis)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 758 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Smith, Kelly) FILED BY ATLAS INDUSTRIES Modified on 7/1/2020, to add filer (jd).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 757 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by BAKER HUGHES (Keating, Philip)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 756 Disclosure Statement. (Mroz, Kenneth)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 755 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosure by OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.( in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ) (Lamperski, Vincent)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 754 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosure by MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY (Lamperski, Vincent)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 753 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosure by CLYDE UNION, INC.(individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), CLYDE UNION, INC. (Lamperski, Vincent)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 752 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosure by CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING AMERICA, LLC (Lamperski, Vincent)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 751 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosure by CLEAVER-BROOKS (Lamperski, Vincent)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 750 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosure by BURNHAM LLC (Lamperski, Vincent)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 749 TEXT ORDER re #737 Notice filed by TRANE U.S. INC., INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION. Plaintiffs shall respond to said notice by 7/6/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/30/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 748 TEXT ORDER APPROVING re #734 Stipulation of Dismissal. In light of the parties stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), this action is dismissed without prejudice as to all claims and causes of action filed against Goodyear Tire, with each party bearing that party's own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/30/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 747 Errata re #726 Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures Reason for Correction: Incorrect Document attached. (Warhola, Adam)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 746 Errata re #730 Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures Reason for Correction: Incorrect Document attached. (Baranyai, Bridget)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 745 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by GOULD ELECTRONICS INC. (Jones, Christopher)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 744 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY (Jones, Christopher)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 743 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosure by THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY (Smallwood, Edward)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 742 Errata re #736 Notice of service of Flowserve US Inc Initial Disclosure Reason for Correction: signature. (Beck, Deborah)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 741 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosure by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY (Smallwood, Edward)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 740 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosure by HUNTER SALES CORPORATION (Evans, Steven)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 739 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURE OF CAMPBELL HAUSFELD, LLC (Gordon, Cathy)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 738 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure by UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION (Sopher, Jeanne)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 737 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing and Stay of Proceedings by INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION, TRANE U.S. INC.( in its own right and as successor to Westinghouse Airbrake and/or WABCO ) (Smallwood, Edward)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 736 NOTICE of service of Intitial Rule 26(a) Disclosure (Beck, Deborah)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 735 NOTICE of Service of Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by RILEY POWER, INC. (Friedman, Julie)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 734 STIPULATION of Dismissal. as to The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Goodyear Tire) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Friedman, Julie) Modified on 6/29/2020 (jd).
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #730 Notice. ERROR: Incorrect document attached. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile the document, using the Errata event and attach the correct document. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order PLEASE DISREGARD THIS CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #726 Notice. ERROR: Incorrect document attached. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile the document, using the Errata event and attach the correct document. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd) Modified on 6/29/2020, THIS WAS SENT IN ERROR (jd).
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #736 Notice. ERROR: Typed name omitted by s/. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. ALSO NO FILER SELECTED< PLEASE SELECT FILER WHEN ENTERING ERRATA (jd) (jd)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #727 Notice. ERROR: Incorrect document attached. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile the document, using the Errata event and attach the correct document. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 733 NOTICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure of Defendant Beazer East, Inc. (Leight, Robert)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 732 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures of DICK CORPORATION (Baranyai, Bridget) Modified on 6/29/2020 to add filer(jd).
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 731 NOTICE of RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURE OF DEFENDANT SPIRAX SARCO, INC. (Busatto, Max)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 730 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Baranyai, Bridget)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 729 NOTICE of RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURE OF DEFENDANT, CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION (Busatto, Max)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 728 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by NAGLE PUMPS, INC. (Warhola, Adam)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 727 NOTICE of RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURE OF DEFENDANT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. (Busatto, Max)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 726 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC. (Warhola, Adam)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 725 NOTICE of Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC's Initial Disclosure Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(a)(I) (Cerrone, Shannan)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 724 NOTICE of Service of Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures of Honeywell International Inc., formerly known as AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation (Friedman, Julie)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 723 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure of Joy Global Surface Mining, Inc. f/k/a P&H Mining Equipment, Inc. f/k/a Harnischfeger Corporation (Lamm, David)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #722 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 722 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Chapman on behalf of TUTHILL CORPORATION. (Chapman, Matthew)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 721 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan) Modified on 6/22/2020 (ma).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 720 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MAGNETEK, INC. (Witte, William) Modified on 6/18/2020 (jmm).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 719 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION. (Witte, William)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 718 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY. (Arriaga, Alba) Modified on 6/22/2020 (ma).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 717 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Arriaga, Alba)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 716 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by SULZER PUMPS (US), INC.. (Hutchinson, Jenna)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 715 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MESTEK, INC.. (Hutchinson, Jenna)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 714 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a) by MESTEK, INC. (Hutchinson, Jenna)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 713 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a) by SULZER PUMPS (US), INC. (Hutchinson, Jenna)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 712 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option filed by RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC. (Orszulak, Joseph) Modified on 6/17/2020 (jd).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 711 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, filed by , Campbell Hausfeld, LLC. (Gordon, Cathy) Modified on 6/17/2020 (jd).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 710 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DARLENE DATA, MICHAEL DATA. (McLeigh, Charles)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 709 SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to Michael Data by DARLENE DATA, MICHAEL DATA. (McLeigh, Charles)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 708 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Stanek, Francis)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 707 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: As more fully set forth herein, Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 6/15/2020; Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 6/30/2020; ADR Stipulation due by 11/30/2020; Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2020; Post-Fact Discovery Status Video Conference set for 12/2/2020 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Summary Judgment on product identification due by 12/11/2020; Response to Summary Judgment due by 1/11/2021; Expert Discovery to be completed by 2/1/2021; Post-Expert Discovery Status Video Conference set for 2/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Substantive Summary Judgment Motion(s) due 2/15/2021; Responses due 3/12/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/29/2020. (ajt)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 706 STATUS REPORT Joint by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Neft, Bryan)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 705 Disclosure Statement identifying Trane Technologies plc, an Irish public limited company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TRANE U.S. INC.( in its own right and as successor to Westinghouse Airbrake and/or WABCO ). (Smith, Kelly)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 704 Disclosure Statement identifying Trane Technologies plc, an Irish public limited company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION. (Smith, Kelly)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 703 Errata re #702 Notice of Appearance Reason for Correction: Signature Required. (Beck, Deborah)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 702 NOTICE of Appearance. (Beck, Deborah)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #702 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Typed name omitted by s/. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only., CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Incorrect filer selected. CORRECTION: Correct filer Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco Inc., Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing properly linked to Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 701 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULE 26(A)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURE by REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC. (Smallwood, Edward)
May 17, 2020 Opinion or Order FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 700 TEXT ORDER: The parties, through lead counsel and in consultation with the defense liaison group, shall file a joint status report by 5/30/2020. The status report shall include (1) dates by which the parties shall submit a Rule 26(f) Report, ADR Stipulation, willingness to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction and joint proposed case management order; (2) all parties that Plaintiffs agree to voluntarily dismiss from the case; and (3) whether the parties seek a stay in this case and the length of the stay. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/12/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
April 26, 2020 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 699 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosure by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Wimer, Matthew)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 698 TEXT ORDER approving #697 Rule 41(a) Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant United States Steel Corporation. This Defendant is dismissed from this action in its entirety and with prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/30/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
March 28, 2020 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania (WDPA) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found at #here . Currently, multiple attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WDPA e-filing attorneys once the WDPA NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to the e-filing account. If you have an upgraded PACER account, no action is required until after the WDPA NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on May 26, 2020. You have an upgraded PACER account if you (1) e-file in another NextGen court, or (2) created your PACER account after August 10, 2014. If neither of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WDPA CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Further informational notices will be sent later, but if you have questions about upgrading your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 697 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Clements, Scott)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 696 TEXT ORDER denying re #693 Motion for Disclosure, #694 Motion for Disclosure. Per the Court's 691 Order of 3/25/2020, Rule 26 Disclosures are not filed with the court on the docket and are only to be exchanged between parties. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/26/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 695 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULE 26(a)(1) DISCLOSURE OF A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC. (Martin-O'Bryan, Kimberly )
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 694 MOTION for Disclosure of Statement. (Martin-O'Bryan, Kimberly )
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 693 MOTION for Disclosure of Rule 26(a)(1). (Martin-O'Bryan, Kimberly )
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 692 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Martin-O'Bryan on behalf of A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC. (Martin-O'Bryan, Kimberly ) Modified text on 3/27/2020.
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 691 TEXT ORDER: The parties are notified that they need not file Notices of Service of Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosures with the court. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/25/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 690 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosure by FOSTER WHEELER LLC (Wolford, Dennis)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 689 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosure by GREENE TWEED & COMPANY (Wolford, Dennis)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 688 NOTICE of Valtek's Rule 26 Disclosure (Turlik, John)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 687 NOTICE of Nortek's Rule 26 Disclosure (Turlik, John)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 686 NOTICE of Rule 26 Disclosure filed by BW/IP, Inc (Turlik, John) Modified text on 3/25/2020, to add name of filer. (jd)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 685 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Automatic Disclosures by Defendant Hyster-Yale Group, Inc. (Welter, Joseph) Modified text on 3/25/2020, to add Defendant name. (jd)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 684 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey N Kinsey on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. (Kinsey, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 683 NOTICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosure Rule 26(a) by HONEYWELL, INC. (Santos, Eric)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 682 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Arthur, Aaron)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 681 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Arthur, Aaron)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 680 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. (Arthur, Aaron)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 679 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by GRINNELL, LLC (Arthur, Aaron)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 678 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by GOULDS PUMPS, LLC (Arthur, Aaron)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 677 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by ELLIOTT COMPANY (Arthur, Aaron)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 676 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by SURFACE COMBUSTION re #675 Disclosure Statement (Malone, Patrick)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 675 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SURFACE COMBUSTION. (Malone, Patrick)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 674 Disclosure Statement identifying California Coastal Communities as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WT/HRC CORPORATION. (Huetter, Glenn)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 673 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TRUMBALL INDUSTRIES. (Huetter, Glenn) Modified text on 3/20/2020. (jd)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 672 Disclosure Statement identifying a non-governmental corporate party, is owned by Sundyne US Purchaser, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SUNDYNE, LLC. (Huetter, Glenn)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 671 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SIMAKAS COMPANY, INC. (Huetter, Glenn) Modified text on 3/20/2020. (jd)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 670 Disclosure Statement identifying subsidiary of Grant Prideco, Inc. and National Oilwell Varco, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ROBBINS & MYERS, INC.. (Huetter, Glenn)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 669 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by POWER PIPING COMPANY. (Huetter, Glenn)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 668 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MVS COMPANY. (Huetter, Glenn)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 667 Disclosure Statement identifying Subsidiaries Robbins & Myers Holdings, LLC, Robbins & Myers, Inc., Grant Prideco, Inc., National Oilwell Varco, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MOYNO, INC.. (Huetter, Glenn)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 666 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION . (Huetter, Glenn) Modified text on 3/20/2020. (jd)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 665 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCMASTER CARR SUPPLY. (Huetter, Glenn)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 664 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION. (Huetter, Glenn)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 663 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ABB, INC.(as successor to Brown Boveri (Individually and as successor-in-interest to ITE IMPERIAL CO f/k/a ITE CIRCUIT BREAKER COMPANY)). (Huetter, Glenn)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER granting #661 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/19/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (nll)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 661 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kimberly A. Martin-O'Bryan by A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC. Fee Paid, Receipt #0315-5492544 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Appendix Appendix, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Martin-O'Bryan, Kimberly ) Modified text on 3/19/2020. (jd) Modified text on 3/19/2020. (nll)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER granting #655 Motion to Modify as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/4/2020. (ajt)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ORDER granting #657 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elisabeth R. Bala to Appear for Bryan Steam, LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/4/20. (Eddy, J.)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 658 TEXT ORDER approving re #656 Stipulation of Dismissal. POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS is dismissed from the complaint with prejudice, with Plaintiff and Powermaster Pacific Products to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/4/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 657 MOTION for attorney Elisabeth R. Bala to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5494592) by BRYAN STEAM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Elisabeth R. Bala, Esq., #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bala, Elisabeth)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 656 STIPULATION of dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Friedman, Julie)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 655 MOTION to Modify Paragraph 1 #545 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neft, Bryan)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 654 OMNIBUS ANSWER to Complaint OMNIBUS ANSWER TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS AND/OR THIRD PARTY COMPLAINTS by TUTHILL CORPORATION. (Chiodo, Edward)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 653 OMNIBUS ANSWER to Complaint OMNIBUS ANSWER TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS AND/OR THIRD PARTY COMPLAINTS by MET-PRO CORPORATION(and its Dean Pump brand). (Chiodo, Edward)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 652 NOTICE of Appearance. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 651 NOTICE of Appearance. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 650 NOTICE of Appearance. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 649 NOTICE PURSUANT TO ORDER OF COURT DATED JANUARY 24, 2020 by DARLENE DATA, MICHAEL DATA re #545 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (McLeigh, Charles)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 648 NOTICE of Appearance. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 647 NOTICE of Appearance. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 646 NOTICE of Appearance. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 645 NOTICE of Appearance. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
February 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ANSWER to #31 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC. (McGeary, Hunter)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BRYAN STEAM, LLC. (Mueller, William)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ANSWER to Complaint by MACK TRUCKS, INC.. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 641 NOTICE of Appearance. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 640 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #428 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lowery, Katherine)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC.. (Singley, David)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BRAND INSULATIONS, INC.. (Singley, David)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC.. (Singley, David)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Singley, David)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 635 Sulzer Pumps Solutions Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint - Answer to All Crossclaims filed by Co-Defendants by AHLSTROM PUMPS LLC. (Hutchinson, Jenna)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ANSWER to #31 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by HONEYWELL, INC.. (Caloyer, Mark)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 633 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING, STAY OF PROCEEDINGS, AND ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Watson, Jennifer)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ANSWER to Complaint All Crossclaims filed by Co-Defendants by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ANSWER to Complaint Answers to All Crossclaims Filed By Co-Defendants by BEAZER EAST, INC.(in its own right and as successor to Koppers Co., Inc., and other related companies, including Thiem Corporation, Beazer USA, Inc., and Beazer, PLC ). (Leight, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to All Crossclaims filed by Co-Defendants by MESTEK, INC.. (Leight, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 629 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher H. Jones on behalf of GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Jones, Christopher)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 628 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher H. Jones on behalf of WEIL-MCLAIN COMPANY. (Jones, Christopher)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 627 NOTICE of Appearance by David James Singley on behalf of WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC.. (Singley, David)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to All Cross-claims filed by Co-Defendants by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Koch, Nicholas)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 625 NOTICE of Appearance by David James Singley on behalf of WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC.. (Singley, David)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 624 NOTICE of Appearance by David James Singley on behalf of BRAND INSULATIONS, INC.. (Singley, David)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SURFACE COMBUSTION. (Malone, Patrick)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 622 NOTICE of Appearance by David James Singley on behalf of RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Singley, David)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by LINDBERG MPH. (Schaper, Joseph)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 620 LOCAL RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE by LINDBERG MPH . (Schaper, Joseph)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 619 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Brick on behalf of REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Brick, Joshua)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 618 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Evans on behalf of THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Evans, Steven)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 617 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Evans on behalf of THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Evans, Steven)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 616 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Caloyer on behalf of HONEYWELL, INC.. (Caloyer, Mark)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 615 WT/HRC Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Reply to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM S Against All Defendants against All Defendants by WT/HRC CORPORATION. (Huetter, Glenn)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 614 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald H. Smith on behalf of HONEYWELL, INC.. (Smith, Donald)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 613 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W. Santos on behalf of HONEYWELL, INC.. (Santos, Eric)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 612 TEXT ORDER: The deadline set forth in the #545 Order pertaining to notification of identities of appointed lead defense counsel or motion for other case management deadlines is extended to March 6, 2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/4/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 611 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick R. Malone on behalf of SURFACE COMBUSTION. (Malone, Patrick)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER granting #586 Motion for William F. Mueller to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/31/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (nll)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 609 NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter A. McGeary, Jr on behalf of BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC. (McGeary, Hunter)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER granting #540 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Defendant Marmon Holdings Inc., only by DARLENE DATA, MICHAEL DATA.Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/31/2020. (sms)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 607 NOTICE of Appearance by David Emil Lamm on behalf of SAUER, INC.. (Lamm, David)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 606 NOTICE of Appearance by David Emil Lamm on behalf of JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.. (Lamm, David)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 605 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Welch Sopher on behalf of DANIELI CORPORATION. (Sopher, Jeanne)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 604 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo G. Daly on behalf of OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.( in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ). (Daly, Leo)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 603 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo G. Daly on behalf of CLYDE UNION, INC.(individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), CLYDE UNION, INC.. (Daly, Leo)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 602 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo G. Daly on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Daly, Leo)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 601 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.( in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ). (Adomitis, Andrew)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 600 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of CLYDE UNION, INC.(individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), CLYDE UNION, INC.. (Adomitis, Andrew)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 599 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Adomitis, Andrew)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 598 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.( in its own right and as successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation ). (Lamperski, Vincent)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 597 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of CLYDE UNION, INC.(individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company), CLYDE UNION, INC.. (Lamperski, Vincent)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 596 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Lamperski, Vincent)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ANSWER to Complaint Crossclaims of All Defendants by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Wimer, Matthew)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 594 SPX Cooling Technologies' ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Wimer, Matthew)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 593 Disclosure Statement identifying SPX Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Wimer, Matthew)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 592 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Wimer on behalf of SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Wimer, Matthew)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 591 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Evans on behalf of HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Evans, Steven)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by INDUSTRIAL RUBBER PRODUCTS. (English, Jason)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 589 NOTICE of Appearance. (English, Jason)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 588 NOTICE of Appearance by William F Mueller on behalf of BRYAN STEAM, LLC. (Mueller, William)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL(and all its domestic subsidiaries including The Badger Company, Inc. ). (English, Jason)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 586 MOTION for attorney William F. Mueller to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5448036) by BRYAN STEAM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit) (Mueller, William)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 585 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Welch Sopher on behalf of UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION. (Sopher, Jeanne)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 584 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly L Smith on behalf of HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Smith, Kelly)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 583 NOTICE of Appearance. (English, Jason)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 582 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Smallwood, Edward)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by WATSON McDANIEL COMPANY. (English, Jason)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 580 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. English on behalf of WATSON McDANIEL COMPANY. (English, Jason)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 579 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 578 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Schaper on behalf of LINDBERG MPH. (Schaper, Joseph)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 577 NOTICE of Appearance. (Schaper, Joseph)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 576 NOTICE of Appearance. (Gordon, Cathy)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 575 NOTICE of Appearance. (Miller, Edward)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 574 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Wendy West Feinstein terminated. (Arthur, Aaron)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 573 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Wendy West Feinstein terminated. (Arthur, Aaron)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 572 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Wendy West Feinstein terminated. (Arthur, Aaron)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 571 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Wendy West Feinstein terminated. (Arthur, Aaron)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 570 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Arthur on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS, LLC. Attorney Wendy West Feinstein terminated. (Arthur, Aaron)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 569 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Wendy West Feinstein terminated. (Arthur, Aaron)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 568 NOTICE of Appearance. (McMeekin, John)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 567 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Scheuring on behalf of MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Scheuring, Gregory)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 566 NOTICE of Appearance. (Scheuring, Gregory)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 565 NOTICE of Appearance. (Scheuring, Gregory)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 564 NOTICE of Appearance. (Mangino, Joni)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 563 NOTICE of Appearance. (Mangino, Joni)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 562 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni M. Mangino on behalf of MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Mangino, Joni)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 561 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric K. Falk on behalf of RILEY POWER, INC.. (Falk, Eric)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 560 NOTICE of Appearance. (Falk, Eric)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 559 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric K. Falk on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Falk, Eric)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 558 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Nord Friedman on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Friedman, Julie)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 557 NOTICE of Appearance. (Friedman, Julie)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 556 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Nord Friedman on behalf of RILEY POWER, INC.. (Friedman, Julie)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 555 NOTICE of Appearance. (Friedman, Julie)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 554 NOTICE of Appearance. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 553 NOTICE of Appearance. (Margolin, Erin)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 552 NOTICE of Appearance. (Karaffa, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ANSWER to Complaint , Reply to All Cross-Claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by TRUMBULL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Huetter, Glenn)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SIMAKAS COMPANY, INC.. (Huetter, Glenn)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 549 NOTICE of Appearance. (Wolford, Dennis)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 548 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis F. Wolford on behalf of GREENE TWEED & COMPANY. (Wolford, Dennis)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 547 NOTICE of Appearance. (Hogan, Robert)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 546 NOTICE of Appearance. (Friedman, Julie)
January 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER: As more fully set forth herein, Appointment of Lead Defense Counsel by 2/25/20; Lead Defense Counsel Stipulation by 3/10/20; Notice of Appearance by unrepresented parties by 1/30/2020; and Motion for Default or Voluntary Dismissal by 2/14/20. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/24/2020. (ajt)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER granting #542 Motion for James H. Keale to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/10/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER granting #541 Motion for Robert M. Gilmartin, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/10/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 542 MOTION for attorney James H. Keale to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5417212). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of JHK ISO Motion, #2 Proposed Order) (Keale, James)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 541 MOTION for attorney Robert M. Gilmartin, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5417169). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of RMG ISO Motion, #2 Proposed Order) (Gilmartin, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 540 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Defendant Marmon Holdings Inc., only by DARLENE DATA, MICHAEL DATA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shipp, Jason)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 539 NOTICE of Appearance. (Lejeune, Peter)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 538 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint to All Cross Claims and/or Third Party Complaints by CORNING INCORPORATED(on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories business division ). (Schollaert, John)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 537 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Reilly on behalf of MACK TRUCKS, INC.. (Reilly, Patrick)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 536 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint and/or Third Party Complaints and Answer to All Cross-Claims by MARMON HOLDINGS, INC.. (Gordon, Cathy)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint and/or Third Party Complaints and Answer to All Cross-Claims by CAMPBELL HAUSFELD, LLC. (Gordon, Cathy)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 534 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by TRANE U.S. INC.( in its own right and as successor to Westinghouse Airbrake and/or WABCO ). (Smallwood, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 533 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by ATLAS INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Smith, Kelly)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 532 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Smith, Kelly)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 531 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION. (Smith, Kelly)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 530 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 529 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by CATERPILLAR, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 528 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 527 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All crossclaims by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.(in its own right, and as successor-in-interest to I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company ). (Insco, James)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 525 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All Crossclaims by ZURN INDUSTRIES. (Miller, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All Crossclaims by WATTS REGULATOR CO.. (Insco, James)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 523 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All Cross Claims by GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Miller, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 522 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All Crossclaims by FLOWSERVE US INC.(solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Edward Valves Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company ). (Miller, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 521 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All Crossclaims by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION. (Miller, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 520 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All Crossclaims by CARRIER CORPORATION. (Miller, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 519 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All Crossclaims by ACCO MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTION, INC.. (Miller, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 518 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All Crossclaims by JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC. (Miller, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All Cross-Claims by EICHLEAY CORPORATION. (Krauth, Daniel)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 516 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All Cross-Claims by ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.. (Krauth, Daniel)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 515 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All Cross-Claims by MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY. (Jones, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY. (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 513 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by CERTAINTEED CORPORATION. (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 512 Amended ANSWER to Complaint , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CERTAINTEED CORPORATION. (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 511 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint All Cross-Claims by GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Jones, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 510 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by RCH NEW CO., II LLC(an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company). (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 509 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by VIKING PUMP, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 508 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 507 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by MCCARLS, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 506 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY. (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 505 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.(as successor by merger to The Garp Company, formerly known as The Gage Company, formerly known as The Gage Company, formerly known as Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Company). (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 504 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by DAP, INC. (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 503 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 502 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION(successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.). (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 501 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by DANA COMPANIES, LLC. (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 500 Omnibus ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by CUMMINS, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 499 Disclosure Statement identifying DBMP LLC, a North Carolina limited liability company. Compagnie de Saint-Gobain as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Watson, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to All Crossclaims by INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Ennis, Adam)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ANSWER to Complaint Omnibus Answer to Cross Claims by FLOWSERVE US INC.(successor to Valtek International ). (Turlik, John)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ANSWER to Complaint Omnibus Answer to All Cross Claims by NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC. (Turlik, John)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ANSWER to Complaint Omnibus Answer to All Cross Claims by BW/IP, INC.. (Turlik, John)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 494 REPLY BRIEF re #474 Response in Opposition to Alfa Laval, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. (Lowery, Katherine)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 493 Master ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third-Party Complaints) by YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Feinstein, Wendy)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 492 Master ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third-Party Complaints) by JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.. (Feinstein, Wendy)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 491 Master ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third Party Complaints) by ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Feinstein, Wendy)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 490 Master ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third-Party Complaints) by GRINNELL, LLC. (Feinstein, Wendy)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 489 Master ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third-Party Complaints) by GOULDS PUMPS, LLC. (Feinstein, Wendy)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Master ANSWER to Complaint (All Cross-Claims and/or Third-Party Complaints) by ELLIOTT COMPANY. (Feinstein, Wendy)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 487 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF SARAH J. SIMKIN ONLY (Simkin, Sarah)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 486 TEXT ORDER denying #476 Motion for Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint. The court does not ordinarily hold oral argument on motions to dismiss. If it becomes clear that oral argument is necessary in this case, the court will schedule argument on the matter at that time. The court addresses dispositive motions pending before the court in the order they become ripe and will address the pending motions to dismiss in this case in due course. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/18/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ANSWER to Complaint and All Counter-Claims filed by Co-Defendants by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Koch, Nicholas)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 484 NOTICE of No Opposition by DARLENE DATA, MICHAEL DATA re #476 Motion for Hearing (Shipp, Jason)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ANSWER to Complaint Omnibus Answer to Crossclaims of Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(as successor-in-interest to the Bendix Corporation ). (Hogan, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ANSWER to Complaint Omnibus Answer to Crossclaims of Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS. (Hogan, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ANSWER to Complaint Omnibus Answer to Crossclaims of Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (Hogan, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ANSWER to Complaint Omnibus Answer to Crossclaims of Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RILEY POWER, INC.. (Hogan, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ANSWER to Complaint Omnibus Answer to Crossclaims of Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Hogan, Robert)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 478 TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #476 Motion for Hearing: Plaintiffs' Response to Motion due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/4/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Caterpillar, Inc.'s Amended ANSWER to Complaint of Michael Data and Darlene Data, CROSSCLAIM Against Co-Defendants against All Defendants by CATERPILLAR, INC.. (Alexander, Tiffany)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 476 MOTION for Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint. (McMeekin, John)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 475 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 Motion to Dismiss, #40 Brief in Support of Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (McMeekin, John)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 474 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO ALFA LAVAL INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT to #433 Brief in Support of Motion, #428 Motion to Dismiss, filed by DARLENE DATA, MICHAEL DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Shipp, Jason)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 473 NOTICE of Appearance ON BEHALF OF W.W. GRAINGER, INC. . (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 10/24/2019. (jd)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 472 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 470 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Lowery, Katherine)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 469 NOTICE of Appearance. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ANSWER to Complaint to Any and All, CROSSCLAIM of Co-Defendants against All Defendants by JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.. (Vey, Paul)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ANSWER to Complaint to Any and All, CROSSCLAIM of All Co-Defendants against All Defendants by SAUER, INC.. (Vey, Paul)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 466 NOTICE of Appearance. (McGeary, Hunter)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 465 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. (McGeary, Hunter) Modified text on 10/22/2019. (jd)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ANSWER to Complaint All Counter-Claims filed by Co-Defendants by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ANSWER to Complaint by FLOWSERVE US INC.(solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Edward Valves Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company ). (Crimarki, Christine)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER TO ANY AND ALL CROSSCLAIMS by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Allied Corporation (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Allied Chemical (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Wilputte Coke Oven Corporation ). (Mroz, Kenneth)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 461 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION To Docket No. 59 and to #39 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Michael Data. (Shipp, Jason)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 460 Disclosure Statement identifying Berkshire Hathaway Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MARMON HOLDINGS, INC.. (Gordon, Cathy)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 459 Disclosure Statement identifying Berkshire Hathaway Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CAMPBELL HAUSFELD, LLC. (Gordon, Cathy)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ANSWER to #31 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CAMPBELL HAUSFELD, LLC. (Gordon, Cathy)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ANSWER to #31 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MARMON HOLDINGS, INC.. (Gordon, Cathy)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM OF FMC CORPORATION by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Allied Corporation (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Allied Chemical (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Wilputte Coke Oven Corporation ). (Mroz, Kenneth)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that cross defendants shall, to the extent practicable, submit omnibus answers to crossclaims; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 21-day deadline to answer a crossclaim under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(1)(B) is relaxed and counsel shall use their best judgment in determining the proper time to file an omnibus answer to the crossclaims; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that for all crossclaims filed on or before September 25, 2019, no omnibus answer shall be filed later than November 29, 2019. The court will enter another order with respect to any crossclaims filed after the date of this order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/25/2019. (ajt)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM OF HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC. by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Allied Corporation (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Allied Chemical (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Wilputte Coke Oven Corporation ). (Mroz, Kenneth)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM OF STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Allied Corporation (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Allied Chemical (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Wilputte Coke Oven Corporation ). (Mroz, Kenneth)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM OF MCNALLY INDUSTRIES, INC. by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Allied Corporation (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Allied Chemical (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Wilputte Coke Oven Corporation ). (Mroz, Kenneth)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Disclosure Statement identifying Clyde Union (US), Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CLYDE UNION, INC. (Lamperski, Vincent) Modified text on 9/26/2019. (tt)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Answer due from W.W. GRAINGER, INC. on 10/8/2019. (Lowery, Katherine)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 449 NOTICE of Appearance of Katherine Lowery on behalf of W.W. GRAINGER, INC. (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 9/26/2019. (tt)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(in its own right and as successor-in-interest to Allied Corporation (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Allied Chemical (Wilputte Coke Oven Division), and as successor-in-interest to Wilputte Coke Oven Corporation ). (Mroz, Kenneth)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Disclosure Statement identifying Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.. (Welter, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.. (Welter, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 445 Disclosure Statement identifying Watts Water Technologies, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY. (Lamperski, Vincent) Modified text on 9/26/2019. (tt)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Mroz, Kenneth)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 443 Disclosure Statement identifying Mueller Co., LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Selep, Joseph)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 442 Disclosure Statement identifying Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Selep, Joseph)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 441 McNally Industries' ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MCNALLY INDUSTRIES, LLC(in its own right and its Northern Pumps Division, in its own right ). (Lowery, Katherine)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 440 Sterling Fluid System's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC. (Lowery, Katherine)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 439 FMC Corporaton's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirnative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC CORPORATION. (Lowery, Katherine)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION(and its division Jerguson Gage and Valve ). (Busatto, Max)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 437 Disclosure Statement identifying Pentair Valves as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PENTAIR VALVES & CONTROLS, LLC. (Selep, Joseph) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 436 Disclosure Statement identifying Crosby Valve as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CROSBY VALVE, LLC. (Selep, Joseph) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 435 TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #428 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due by 10/25/2019. Defendant's Reply brief due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/10/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Disclosure Statement identifying Mallinckrodt plc (Ireland) as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MALLINCKRODT US HOLDINGS, LLC. (Helbling, Jill)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 433 BRIEF in Support re #428 Motion to Dismiss filed by ALF A LAV AL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jd)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #430 Disclosure Statement, #431 Disclosure Statement, #432 Disclosure Statement, #429 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: NO filer selected. CORRECTION: Attoreny advised that in the future they are to select the filer and connect it to the filing - Correct filer properly linked to Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #428 Motion to Dismiss. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support of Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC. (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 9/11/2019. (tt)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 431 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCNALLY INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 9/11/2019. (tt)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 430 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FMC CORPORATION. (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 9/11/2019. (tt)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 429 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALFA LAVAL, INC. (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 9/11/2019. (tt)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 428 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, by ALFA LAVAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Lowery, Katherine) Modified text on 9/11/2019. (tt)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #423 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #424 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #425 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #426 Disclosure Statement, #427 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match, filing attorneys signature must appear first. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Disclosure Statement identifying SPIRAX-SARCO ENGINEERING, PLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SPIRAX SARCO, INC.. (Busatto, Max)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 426 Disclosure Statement identifying AB ELECTROLUX as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC.. (Busatto, Max)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ANSWER to Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION(and its division Jerguson Gage and Valve ). (Busatto, Max)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ANSWER to Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SPIRAX SARCO, INC.. (Busatto, Max)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ANSWER to Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC. (Busatto, Max)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 422 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Friedman, Julie) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) to Crosclaim of Swindell Dressler by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Mroz, Kenneth)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 420 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY. (Lowery, Katherine)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 419 Defendant Swindell-Dressler International Company's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY. (Lowery, Katherine)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims and Answer to, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WATTS REGULATOR CO. (Insco, James)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims and Answer to, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.(in its own right, and as successor-in-interest to I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company ). (Insco, James)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 416 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Ward on behalf of COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.. (Ward, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 415 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC. (Mroz, Kenneth) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.. (Mroz, Kenneth)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 413 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.. (Ward, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Answer to Crossclaims and Jury Demand against All Defendants by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORP.. (Ward, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 411 TEXT ORDER granting #229 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: MARMON HOLDINGS, INC answer due 9/27/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/27/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 410 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Mroz on behalf of ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC. (Mroz, Kenneth) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM AND ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS against All Defendants by CROWN CORK & SEAL USA, INC. (Rogers, William James) Modified text on 8/28/2019. (ajt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 408 TEXT ORDER granting #228 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Campbell Hausfeld, LLC's answer due 9/27/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/27/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Answer to crossclaims of all defendants ANSWER to #392 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Roenigk, Cindi)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Errata re #163 Disclosure Statement, by FLOWSERVE US INC. Reason for Correction: Signature. (Crimarki, Christine) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Errata re #162 Notice of Appearance, by FLOWSERVE US INC. Reason for Correction: Signature. (Crimarki, Christine) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 404 NOTICE CERTIFICATION OF GOOD FAITH REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS by PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY re #39 Motion to Dismiss (McMeekin, John)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 403 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Krescanko on behalf of EATON CORPORATION(as successor-in-interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc.). (Krescanko, Ryan)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Karaffa on behalf of UB WEST VIRGINIA, INC.. (Karaffa, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 401 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Karaffa on behalf of MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC. (Karaffa, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Disclosure Statement identifying CECO Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MET-PRO CORPORATION. (Polaski, William) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 399 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Karaffa on behalf of CASHCO INC.. (Karaffa, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #163 Disclosure Statement, #162 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Typed name omitted, no signature. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by NAGLE PUMPS, INC.. (Warhola, Adam)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 397 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NAGLE PUMPS, INC. (Warhola, Adam) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 396 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Warhola on behalf of NAGLE PUMPS, INC. (Warhola, Adam) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC.. (Warhola, Adam)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Disclosure Statement identifying SA Armstrong Limited as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC.. (Warhola, Adam)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Warhola on behalf of ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC.. (Warhola, Adam)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Cerrone, Shannan)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Cerrone, Shannan) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannan Cerrone on behalf of ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Cerrone, Shannan) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.. (Cerrone, Shannan)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 388 Disclosure Statement identifying Fives North American Combustion, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.. (Cerrone, Shannan)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannan Cerrone on behalf of NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.. (Cerrone, Shannan)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC. (Cerrone, Shannan)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM AND ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS against All Defendants by AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY. (Clements, Scott)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MW Custom Papers, LLC ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC. (Karaffa, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ANSWER to Complaint by CATERPILLAR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Alexander, Tiffany)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RCH NEW CO., II LLC(an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company). (Watson, Jennifer)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 378 Disclosure Statement identifying as Cutler-Hammer, inc. corporate parent or other affiliate, by EATON CORPORATION (Karaffa, Michael) Modified text on 8/27/2019. (jd)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Nortek Global HVAC ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC. (Turlik, John)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CATERPILLAR, INC.. (Alexander, Tiffany) Modified text on 8/27/2019, TO EDIT ENTRY TO ADD THE WORD NONE. (jd)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by DANA COMPANIES, LLC. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ALF A LAV AL, INC. Answer due from ALF A LAV AL, INC. on 9/9/2019. (Lowery, Katherine)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Answers to Cross-Claims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CERTAINTEED CORPORATION. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Disclosure Statement identifying Watss Regulator Company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WATTS REGULATOR CO. (Insco, James)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 371 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of ALF A LAV AL, INC.. (Lowery, Katherine)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Disclosure Statement identifying Enstar Holdings (US) LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DANA COMPANIES, LLC. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified text on 9/12/2019. (tt)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Disclosure Statement identifying Union Boiler as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UB WEST VIRGINIA, INC.. (Karaffa, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368