WILLIAMS v. EXTENDED STAY AMERICA HOTEL et al
Plaintiff: RACOCO WILLIAMS
Defendant: CHERYL SAFAR, EXTENDED STAY AMERICA HOTEL and DANIELLE MAISEL
Case Number: 2:2019cv00898
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the Complaint, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, and waiver, and this order to Defendants as directed by the Plaintiff, costs to be advanced by the United States of America. The Defendants are requested to waive service pursuant to Rule 4(d). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/30/2019. (sms)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR SERVICE DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff shall provide the Court with proper instructions for service upon each named defendant listed in the Complaint including a U.S. Marshal Form 285, Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (AO Form 398), and Waiver of the Service of Summons (AO Form 399) for each named defendant on or before August 26, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action. No extensions will be granted without good cause. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/7/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against EXTENDED STAY AMERICA HOTEL, DANIELLE MAISEL, CHERYL SAFAR (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 24668057689), filed by RACOCO WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Envelope) (sms)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 24668057689 (nll)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. The Complaint filed by Rococo Williams has been received without a filing fee or the forms required to proceed in forma pauperis in a civil rights case. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/29/2019. (ajt)
July 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy presiding. Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly no longer assigned to case. (nll)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: Complaint lodged, no fee or IFP motion received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope) (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. EXTENDED STAY AMERICA HOTEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL SAFAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXTENDED STAY AMERICA HOTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIELLE MAISEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACOCO WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?