WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY v. SANTANA
Plaintiff: WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: COLON SANTANA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00925
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulation to Extension of Time to ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against COLON SANTANA by WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY. (Singley, David)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 10/22/2019. Case Management set for 11/13/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/17/2019. (smc)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/17/2019. (smc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY re #4 Notice of ADR Designation, (Singley, David)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, First COUNTERCLAIM against WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY by COLON SANTANA. (Booker, Stanley)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY. COLON SANTANA served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Singley, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to COLON SANTANA (mao)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COLON SANTANA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5227575), filed by WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Summons) (mao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY v. SANTANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLON SANTANA
Represented By: Stanley T. Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: David James Singley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?