TCHIRKOW v. POWANDA et al
Plaintiff: GREGG TCHIRKOW
Defendant: MICHAEL DEMATT, JOSH SHAPIRO, ALLEN POWANDA and JAMES WILLIAMS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00984
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bethann R. Lloyd terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/2/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Eddy, J.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MICHAEL DEMATT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order) (Lloyd, Bethann)
October 2, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Regoli on behalf of MICHAEL DEMATT. (Regoli, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Clarification as to 26 Order on Motion for Clarification, by GREGG TCHIRKOW. (ma)
October 1, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Clarification as to #31 Reply Brief by GREGG TCHIRKOW. (ma)
September 26, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF re #30 Response to Motion filed by JOSH SHAPIRO. (Bradley, Scott)
September 24, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by GREGG TCHIRKOW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jm)
September 24, 2019 Filing 29 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 10/23/2019, Defendants Allen Powanda, James Williams, and Michael DeMatt shall each complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. The Court notes that Plaintiff's election form was filed and ECF No. #2 and Defendant Josh Shapiro's election form was filed at ECF No. #13 . Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/24/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
September 23, 2019 Filing 28 TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Plaintiff shall file a Brief in Opposition due by 10/23/2019 - brief is limited to 10 pages double-spaced with 12 point font; Defendant's Reply brief due by 11/6/2019 - brief limited to 3 pages double spaced with 12 point font. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/23/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
September 23, 2019 Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: MICHAEL DEMATT answer due 10/30/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/23/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
September 23, 2019 Filing 26 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #21 Motion for Clarification. The motion is denied, as Plaintiff does not set forth any relief he seeks from the court. Further, to the extent Plaintiff complains of Defendant Dematt being unrepresented by counsel, counsel has entered an appearance on the record.Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/23/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
September 20, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEF in Support re #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JOSH SHAPIRO. (Bradley, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JOSH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bradley, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by MICHAEL DEMATT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lloyd, Bethann)
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #16 Memorandum Order, filed by GREGG TCHIRKOW. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Clarification by GREGG TCHIRKOW. (jm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ALLEN POWANDA answer due 10/21/2019; JOSH SHAPIRO answer due 10/21/2019; JAMES WILLIAMS answer due 10/21/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/16/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by GREGG TCHIRKOW by ALLEN POWANDA, JAMES WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Regoli, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Regoli on behalf of JAMES WILLIAMS. (Regoli, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Regoli on behalf of ALLEN POWANDA. (Regoli, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM ORDER striking re #14 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GREGG TCHIRKOW, #15 Motion for Clarification filed by GREGG TCHIRKOW Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/10/2019. (ajt)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Clarification to Verify Responsibility to Send Documents by GREGG TCHIRKOW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C) (cjo)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GREGG TCHIRKOW. (cjo)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JOSH SHAPIRO. (Bradley, Scott)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Bradley on behalf of JOSH SHAPIRO. (Bradley, Scott)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT in Support of #1 Complaint, by GREGG TCHIRKOW. (jv)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed MICHAEL DEMATT served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (jv)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed JOSH SHAPIRO served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (jv)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed ALLEN POWANDA served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (jv)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed JAMES WILLIAMS served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (jv)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: On this date, Plaintiff presented himself to the undersigned's chambers asking for clarification of a service order in the above-captioned case. Arriving unannounced at chambers seeking clarification of an order or for a status update concerning this case is inappropriate contact with the court. If the court requires Plaintiffs in-person appearance at a scheduled conference or hearing, it will so clarify in an order of court. In the future, to the extent that Plaintiff has any questions concerning his case or seeks clarification of an order of court, he shall file a motion forclarification with the court. The court will take no action on this case until all Defendants have been served. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/3/2019. (ajt)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by GREGG TCHIRKOW to #3 MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal. (jv)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal by GREGG TCHIRKOW. Should Plaintiff wish to proceed with service by U.S. Marshal, the Plaintiff shall provide the Court with proper instructions for service upon each named defendant listed in the Complaint including a U.S. Marshal Form 285, Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (AO Form 398), Waiver of the Service of Summons (AO Form 399), and a copy of the Complaint for each named defendant on or before September 13, 2019. Upon receipt of these documents, the Court will issue its standard order for service by the U.S. Marshal. Plaintiff shall submit these documents to the Court and not directly to the U.S. Marshal. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action. No extensions will be granted without good cause. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/27/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal by GREGG TCHIRKOW. (ept)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by GREGG TCHIRKOW. (ept)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL DEMATT, ALLEN POWANDA, JOSH SHAPIRO, JAMES WILLIAMS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 24668057801), filed by GREGG TCHIRKOW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TCHIRKOW v. POWANDA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL DEMATT
Represented By: David A. Regoli
Represented By: Bethann R. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH SHAPIRO
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN POWANDA
Represented By: David A. Regoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES WILLIAMS
Represented By: David A. Regoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGG TCHIRKOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?