CITY OF SHARON SANITARY AUTHORITY v. SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Plaintiff: CITY OF SHARON SANITARY AUTHORITY
Defendant: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00991
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Christopher T. Lee added as counsel for Defendant Selective Insurance Co. of S. Carolina. Attorney Nicholas A. Pasciullo terminated. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/7/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (Lee, Christopher)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (Pasciullo, Nicholas)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Initial Case Management set for 11/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due on 11/18/19. Defendant shall file an answer on or before September 4, 2019. Counsel for Plaintiff is hereby directed to immediately serve the Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference together with the Complaint upon Defendant or Counsel for Defendant. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/27/19. (lck)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA answer due 9/4/2019.. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/20/19. (ms)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pasciullo, Nicholas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (lck)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/13/19. (lck)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mercer County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-1953 with Jury Demand Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5244620), filed by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complant, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF SHARON SANITARY AUTHORITY v. SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF SHARON SANITARY AUTHORITY
Represented By: Scott D. Cessar
Represented By: John H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Nicholas A. Pasciullo
Represented By: Christopher T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?