LEARN v. HARNICH et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTY LEARN
Defendant: KENNETH HARNICH and GEICO
Case Number: 2:2019cv00993
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Continue. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 10:30AM is hereby RESCHEDULED for 10/23/2019 at 10:30AM. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/24/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by GEICO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hudock, Joseph)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 10/16/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/16/2019; Stipulation due by 10/16/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/20/2019. (av)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (av)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GEICO. (ept) Modified text on 8/13/2019. (ept)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Indiana County, case number 11275 CD 2019 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5245002), filed by GEICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept) Modified text on 8/13/2019. (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEARN v. HARNICH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH HARNICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO
Represented By: Joseph A. Hudock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTY LEARN
Represented By: David A. Colecchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?