HIRSTY v. NUTRIMOST WELLNESS & WEIGHT LOSS LLC
Plaintiff: CRAIG HIRSTY
Defendant: NUTRIMOST WELLNESS & WEIGHT LOSS LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01000
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the initial scheduling conference will be held on November 6, 2019, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 7B, U.S. Post Office and Courthouse Building, 700 Grant Street, Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. Trial counsel shall attend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a Rule 26(f) Report no later than two days before the scheduled conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process no later than two days before the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ADR Form) (jmb)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than October 30, 2019. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by NUTRIMOST WELLNESS & WEIGHT LOSS LLC. (Taylor, Daniel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by NUTRIMOST WELLNESS & WEIGHT LOSS LLC Answer due from NUTRIMOST WELLNESS & WEIGHT LOSS LLC on 10/7/2019. (Taylor, Daniel)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 08/16/2019. (jmb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 COPYRIGHT DOCUMENTS ISSUED. Emailed copy of Transmittal Letter, AO 121 Form, Complaint, Exhibits and Docket Sheet to the Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 AO 121 Form, #6 Civil Docket Sheet) (cel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NUTRIMOST WELLNESS & WEIGHT LOSS LLC (cel)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NUTRIMOST WELLNESS & WEIGHT LOSS LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5246358), filed by CRAIG HIRSTY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Copyright Infringement Form) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIRSTY v. NUTRIMOST WELLNESS & WEIGHT LOSS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUTRIMOST WELLNESS & WEIGHT LOSS LLC
Represented By: Daniel M. Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG HIRSTY
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?