JAHODA v. EVITAMINS, LLC
Plaintiff: ROBERT JAHODA
Defendant: EVITAMINS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01014
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order of Consolidation. This case is consolidated with 1:19-cv-00228, the lead case. All pleadings, Motions and other papers hereafter filed shall be filed at 1:19-cv-00228. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/4/19. (lck)
August 22, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Summons/Returned Returned Executed. ERROR: incorrect date used for service date. CORRECTION: Corrected service date which generated the new answer date of 9/9/2019. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ROBERT JAHODA. EVITAMINS, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Carlson, R.) Modified text on 8/22/2019 to change date of service indicated on document. (jv)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/16/19. (lck)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (lck)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to EVITAMINS, LLC. (ept)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EVITAMINS, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5248363), filed by ROBERT JAHODA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAHODA v. EVITAMINS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVITAMINS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT JAHODA
Represented By: R. Bruce Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?