HOGAN et al v. TOTH et al
Plaintiff: OCEANA ORTH, CALEB NIGRELLI and KRISTEN HOGAN
Defendant: AGENT TOTH, OFFICER FARRELL WAGNER, BRENTWOOD POLICE DEPT. and OFFICER CARL RECH
Case Number: 2:2019cv01016
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by TOTH. (Bradley, Scott)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Bradley on behalf of TOTH. (Bradley, Scott)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BRENTWOOD POLICE DEPT., CARL RECH, TOTH, FARRELL WAGNER, filed by KRISTEN HOGAN, OCEANA ORTH. (cjo)
September 27, 2019 Summons Issued as to BRENTWOOD POLICE DEPT., CARL RECH, TOTH, FARRELL WAGNER (cjo)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 24668058724 (cjo)
August 30, 2019 Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019 (av)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/29/2019. (av)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KRISTEN HOGAN, CALEB NIGRELLI, OCEANA ORTH. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons in a Civil Action, #4 Process Receipt and Return, #5 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #6 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive service of a summons) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOGAN et al v. TOTH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGENT TOTH
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER FARRELL WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENTWOOD POLICE DEPT.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER CARL RECH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCEANA ORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALEB NIGRELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTEN HOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?