JOHNSON v. VERIZON WIRELESS
Plaintiff: JAMEL JOHNSON
Defendant: VERIZON WIRELESS
Case Number: 2:2019cv01032
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Mediation by SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI. Mediation Date 11/12/2019 10:00 am (Cimini, Sally)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Sally Griffith Cimini is appointed as mediator. Party SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/19/2019. (jmb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Compliance with provisions of Rule 16 shall be completed as follows: Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) shall be made by October 4, 2019. Amendments to the pleadings and joinder of additional parties will be completed by November 18, 2019. The ADR process will be completed no later than November 19, 2019. A telephone status conference is scheduled for November 25, 2019 at 11:00 AM. Counsel are to call into the conference by dialing 888-363-4749 and entering the access code 6019141. If asked for a security code, use * to bypass. The parties shall complete fact discovery by February 17, 2020. A status/settlement conference will be held on February 19, 2020 at 11:00 AM. Trial counsel shall attend and the parties shall be available by telephone. No later than 5 business days prior to the conference any party intending to file a motion for summary judgment shall file a statement, no longer than 3 pages, setting forth the grounds on which the motion will be filed. All parties are to be prepared to discuss this at the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/19/2019. (jmb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/19/2019. (jmb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan: An Initial Case Management Conference was held on 9/19/2019. Discussed facts of case. Initial Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: none) (jmb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by VERIZON WIRELESS. (Presley, Marla)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Implementing FRE 502(d)) (Presley, Marla)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JAMEL JOHNSON. (Kobylinski, David)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by VERIZON WIRELESS. (Presley, Marla)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by VERIZON WIRELESS. (Presley, Marla) Document filed in error. Modified text on 9/11/2019. (nll)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura C. Bunting on behalf of VERIZON WIRELESS. (Bunting, Laura)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the initial scheduling conference will be held on September 19, 2019, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 7B, U.S. Post Office and Courthouse Building, 700 Grant Street, Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. Trial counsel shall attend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a Rule 26(f) Report no later than two days before the scheduled conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process no later than two days before the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 08/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ADR Form) (jmb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by VERIZON WIRELESS. (Presley, Marla)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have this case assigned to a District Judge, no later than September 12, 2019. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 08/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 08/22/2019. (jmb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by VERIZON WIRELESS. (Presley, Marla)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary J. Mueller on behalf of VERIZON WIRELESS. (Mueller, Zachary)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-5457 Copies attached: Praecipe for Writ of Summons, Complaint, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5250435), filed by VERIZON WIRELESS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. VERIZON WIRELESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMEL JOHNSON
Represented By: Peter T. Kobylinski
Represented By: David M. Kobylinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON WIRELESS
Represented By: Marla N. Presley
Represented By: Zachary J. Mueller
Represented By: Laura C. Bunting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?