KUTEK v. T.G.C.H., INC.
Plaintiff: MARY BETH KUTEK
Defendant: T.G.C.H., INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01033
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Mediation by MARY BETH KUTEK. Mediation Date December 18, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. (Sansone, Joel)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of ADR, Plaintiff shall file a Notice of ADR by 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/11/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of ADR by MARY BETH KUTEK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sansone, Joel)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Sally Griffith Cimini, Esquire is appointed as mediator; Good cause having been shown, the ADR conference(s) shall be concluded on or before 12/31/19, unless extended by order of the Court; Massimo Terzigni, Esq. is designated as lead counsel and shall be responsible for working with the parties and the neutral to coordinate an agreeable date, time and location for the initial ADR conference; It is the responsibility of lead counsel to ensure that a notice indicating the date, time and location of the ADR session as well as the principles from each party with full settlement authority, who will be in attendance at the ADR session, has been electronically filed with the Court by 10/9/19. The Court shall be promptly noticed of any rescheduled date for the scheduled conference. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/2/19. (jg)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 10/16/19; Motions to Amend/Add Parties due 11/1/19; Joint Discovery Status Reports due by 12/16/19 and 2/16/20; Fact Discovery ends 3/31/20; A Telephonic Post-Fact Discovery Status Conference is set for 4/1/20 at 4:00 PM before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/2/19. (jg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nora Barry Fischer: Case Management Conference held on 10/2/19. Appropriate Orders follow. (Court Reporter: None) (jg)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER entered pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 9/27/19. (jg)
September 25, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. ERROR: Wrong version of form used for this entry. CORRECTION: Counsel is advised the Stipulation Selecting ADR form has been updated. Dispose of all previous versions of the Stipulation and begin using the amended form, with the revision date 4/2017. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Terzigni, Massimo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MARY BETH KUTEK. (Terzigni, Massimo)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER indicating that the Case Management Conference set for 10/2/19 at 4;00 PM is re-set for 10/2/19 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 9/11/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER indicating that the Case Management Conference set for 10/1/19 at 2:30 PM is re-set for 10/2/19 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 9/11/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by T.G.C.H., INC. (Binotto, Phillip)
September 10, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 9/17/2019. (jv)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that the parties' Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process are due by 9/24/19; A Case Management Conference is set for 10/1/19 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 9/10/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by T.G.C.H., INC. (DePaula, Marcia)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia L. DePaula on behalf of T.G.C.H., INC. (DePaula, Marcia)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jana Phillis Grimm on behalf of T.G.C.H., INC. (Grimm, Jana)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip J. Binotto, Jr on behalf of T.G.C.H., INC. (Binotto, Phillip)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARY BETH KUTEK. T.G.C.H., INC. waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Sansone, Joel)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of MARY BETH KUTEK. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Massimo A. Terzigni on behalf of MARY BETH KUTEK. (Terzigni, Massimo)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: 12(B) MOTIONS (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 8/20/2019. (bdk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T.G.C.H., INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5250507), filed by MARY BETH KUTEK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KUTEK v. T.G.C.H., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY BETH KUTEK
Represented By: Joel S. Sansone
Represented By: Massimo A. Terzigni
Represented By: Elizabeth Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.G.C.H., INC.
Represented By: Jana Phillis Grimm
Represented By: Marcia L. DePaula
Represented By: Phillip J. Binotto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?