BITTINGER v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: BARBARA BITTINGER
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, GROUP WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF BUTLER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL and CIGNA GROUP INSURANCE
Case Number: 2:2019cv01060
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby RESCHEDULED for 11/13/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/8/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal of the Group Welfare Benefit Plan for Employees of Butler Memorial Hospital by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Joyce, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Establishing Presumptive Trial Date in Civil Case. Trial set for 5/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/23/2019. (av)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 11/8/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2019; Stipulation due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/9/2019.
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA BITTINGER. GROUP WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF BUTLER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL waiver sent on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Meredith, Susan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Moreland on behalf of GROUP WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF BUTLER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (Moreland, Christopher)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha A. Gill on behalf of GROUP WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF BUTLER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (Gill, Trisha)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA BITTINGER. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA waiver sent on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Meredith, Susan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying Cigna Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Joyce, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Joyce on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Joyce, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (av)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GROUP WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF BUTLER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA (cel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GROUP WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF BUTLER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5257716), filed by BARBARA BITTINGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BITTINGER v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Michael J. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROUP WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF BUTLER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher M. Moreland
Represented By: Trisha A. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA GROUP INSURANCE
Represented By: Michael J. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA BITTINGER
Represented By: Susan A. Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?