SMALIS et al v. CITY OF PITTSBURGH et al
Plaintiff: LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS and ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS
Defendant: DEPT OF BUILDING INSPECTIONS, DEPT OF PUBLIC WORKS, CITY OF PITTSBURGH and DUQUESNE DLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01066
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 24668059108 (jm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw Complaint Against Defendants Duquesne Light Company and US Occupation Safety/Health (OSHA) as Additional Defendants by LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS, ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (cjo)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF COURT denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED and the Clerk of Court is to mark this CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED until such time as Plaintiffs pay the requisite filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/13/2019. A copy of this Notice and Order have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for permission to add US Occupation Safety/Health (OSHA) as an additional defendant by LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS, ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29) (ma)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS, LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS. DEPT OF PUBLIC WORKS served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (nll) Modified text on 9/5/2019. (nll)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS, LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS. CITY OF PITTSBURGH, DEPT OF BUILDING INSPECTIONS served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (nll) Modified text on 9/5/2019. (nll)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS, LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS; Duquesne served on 8/27/19. Answer Due: 9/17/2019 (sdp) Modified text on 9/3/2019. (cel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS, LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS; City of Pittsburgh served on 8/27/19. Answer due 9/17/2019 (sdp) Modified text on 9/3/2019. (cel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion for Permission to Remove Civil Action) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMALIS et al v. CITY OF PITTSBURGH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPT OF BUILDING INSPECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPT OF PUBLIC WORKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PITTSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUQUESNE DLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?