SEALE v. ANNUITY FYI et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL R. SEALE
Defendant: LIFE FUNDING OPTIONS, KATE SNYDER, UPSTATE LAW GROUP, LLC, ANNUITY FYI, FINANCIAL PRODUCTS DISTRIBUTORS, DAVID WOODARD, ANDREW GAMBER, PERFORMANCE ARBITRAGE, CANDY KERN-FULLER and MICHELLE PLANT
Case Number: 2:2019cv01146
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for John B. Veach III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/21/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION for attorney John B. Veach III to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Errata Event (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5325165) Errata Event by DANIEL R. SEALE. (Veach, John)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney John B. Veach III to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Errata Event (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5325165) by DANIEL R. SEALE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit) (Veach, John)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by DANIEL R. SEALE. Attorney Veach is instructed to re-file the documents as an Errata event by 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/11/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
September 24, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Filer of Pro Hac Motion is not the Attorney seeking Pro Hac Admission. CORRECTION: Attorney John B. Tucker is advised to refile the Motion for Pro Hac Using his ECF Account and Signature. Attorney Advised to use the Errata Event to file the Motion and Link it back to the Original Motion. (cjo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney John B. "Tucker" Veach, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5290851) by DANIEL R. SEALE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing) (Horne, Vicki)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (av)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ANNUITY FYI, FINANCIAL PRODUCTS DISTRIBUTORS, ANDREW GAMBER, CANDY KERN-FULLER, LIFE FUNDING OPTIONS, PERFORMANCE ARBITRAGE, MICHELLE PLANT, KATE SNYDER, UPSTATE LAW GROUP, LLC, DAVID WOODARD (ma)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANNUITY FYI, FINANCIAL PRODUCTS DISTRIBUTORS, ANDREW GAMBER, CANDY KERN-FULLER, LIFE FUNDING OPTIONS, PERFORMANCE ARBITRAGE, MICHELLE PLANT, KATE SNYDER, UPSTATE LAW GROUP, LLC, DAVID WOODARD (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5276946), filed by DANIEL R. SEALE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Annuity FYI, #3 Summons Financial Products Distributors, #4 Summons Candy Kern-Fuller, #5 Summons Andrew Gamber, #6 Summons Life Funding Options, #7 Summons Michelle Plant as owner of Life Funding Options, #8 Summons Michelle Plant, #9 Summons Kate Snyder as owner of Life Funding Options, #10 Summons Kate Snyder, #11 Summons Upstate Law, #12 Summons David Woodard as control person of Performance Arbitrage, #13 Summons David Woodard) (ma) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2019: #14 Summons Performance Arbitrage) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEALE v. ANNUITY FYI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE FUNDING OPTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATE SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSTATE LAW GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNUITY FYI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FINANCIAL PRODUCTS DISTRIBUTORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID WOODARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW GAMBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERFORMANCE ARBITRAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANDY KERN-FULLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE PLANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL R. SEALE
Represented By: Vicki Kuftic Horne
Represented By: John Veach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?