THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HEBDA
Plaintiff: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JOANN HEBDA
Case Number: 2:2019cv01149
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42:1471
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ESTABLISHING PRESUMPTIVE TRIAL DATE IN CIVIL CASE. Trial set for 6/14/2021. See accompanying Order for additional details. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/22/2019. (av)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management set for 11/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 11/20/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/20/2019; Stipulation due by 11/20/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/27/2019. (av)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. JOANN HEBDA waiver sent on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Warmbrodt, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #3 Notice of ADR Designation, (Warmbrodt, James)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (av)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JOANN HEBDA (jd)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOANN HEBDA, filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HEBDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: James C. Warmbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANN HEBDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?