JEANNOTTE v. TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NORA JEANNOTTE
Defendant: TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC. and ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv01156
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 11/26/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report and either the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process or the Expedited Docket Stipulation due by 12/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 at 09:00 AM in Suite 9280 before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/07/2019. (tjw)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Case dismissed as to Defendant Traveler's Insurance Group, Inc. ONLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/07/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tjw)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Notice of WITHDRAWAL of Claim As To Travelers by NORA JEANNOTTE. (Nese, Amanda)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig W. Beil on behalf of ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Beil, Craig)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC, and Allstate Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Connell, R.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Connell, R.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Sean O'Connell on behalf of ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Connell, R.)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut; Travelers Property Casualty Company of America; The Travelers Indemnity Company; The Travelers Indemnity Company of America; The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company; and the Phoenix Insurance Company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Collura, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 10/15/2019. (jm)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC. answer due 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/08/2019. (tjw)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by NORA JEANNOTTE by TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Collura, Elizabeth)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Farina Collura on behalf of TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC. (Collura, Elizabeth)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by NORA JEANNOTTE. TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Simon, Marc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by NORA JEANNOTTE. ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Simon, Marc)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/13/2019. (tjw)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5279621), filed by NORA JEANNOTTE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEANNOTTE v. TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth Farina Collura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Craig W. Beil
Represented By: R. Sean O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORA JEANNOTTE
Represented By: Amanda L. Nese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?