GIBSON v. SCHOOLSFIRST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION et al
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS GIBSON
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, SCHOOLSFIRST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION and TRANSUNION, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01166
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Nicholas Linker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5353693) by DEMETRIUS GIBSON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Linker, Nicholas)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 11/21/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report and either the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process or the Expedited Docket Stipulation due by 11/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Suite 9280 before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/29/2019. (tjw)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying Equifax Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
October 7, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 10/15/2019. (jm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC Answer due from EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC on 10/25/2019. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent M. Roskovensky on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 TRANS UNION, LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Huse, William)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for attorney William H. Huse to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/19/2019. (tjw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney William H. Huse to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5288842) by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Huse, William)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/13/2019. (tjw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Trans Union LLC, TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc, TransUnion,TRU, T.Rowe Price Group,TROW as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Greenfield, Stanley)
September 12, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/19/2019. (ma)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-008442 Copies attached: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, Notice to Defend, First Amended Complaint, Removal Order (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5281800), filed by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GIBSON v. SCHOOLSFIRST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Vincent M. Roskovensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHOOLSFIRST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSUNION, LLC
Represented By: Stanley W. Greenfield
Represented By: William M. Huse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS GIBSON
Represented By: Nicholas Linker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?