PEROTTI v. FESTIVAL FUN PARKS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RITA PEROTTI
Defendant: IDLEWILD PARK, FESTIVAL FUN PARKS, LLC and IDLEWILD PARK INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01176
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hannon, Sean)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 10/30/2019, Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 11/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/09/19. (eca)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF COURT. By October 30, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to continue to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/09/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS, LLC. (Hannon, Sean)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Centaur Holdings United States II, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS, LLC, IDLEWILD PARK, IDLEWILD PARK INC. (Hannon, Sean) Modified text on 9/17/2019. (ma)
September 16, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/23/2019. (ma)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Westmoreland County, case number 17CI03973 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5283503), filed by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEROTTI v. FESTIVAL FUN PARKS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDLEWILD PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FESTIVAL FUN PARKS, LLC
Represented By: Sean P. Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDLEWILD PARK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITA PEROTTI
Represented By: Ned J. Nakles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?