BATTAGLIA v. UPMC CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PITTSBURGH
Plaintiff: RACHEL BATTAGLIA
Defendant: UPMC CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PITTSBURGH
Case Number: 2:2019cv01190
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. The Defendant's response is due on or before 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/15/2019. (jgb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Order re #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by UPMC CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PITTSBURGH. (Pagac, Shelly)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by UPMC CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PITTSBURGH Answer due from UPMC CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PITTSBURGH on 11/25/2019. (Pagac, Shelly) Modified text on 11/14/2019. (cel)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UPMC CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PITTSBURGH. (Pagac, Shelly)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RACHEL BATTAGLIA. UPMC CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PITTSBURGH waiver sent on 9/18/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Elzer, Christine)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/18/2019. (jgb) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/18/2019) (jgb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UPMC CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PITTSBURGH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5286298) filed by RACHEL BATTAGLIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BATTAGLIA v. UPMC CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PITTSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPMC CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PITTSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL BATTAGLIA
Represented By: Christine T. Elzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?